Chen v. Pioneer Oil, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jason Chen
Defendant: Kevin Santos-Buch, Trade Group Asia Limited, Pioneer Oil, LLC, Bryan Stromberg, Denhan Enterprises, Inc. and Matrix Supply & Distribution Limited
Respondent: Tad Butt
Case Number: 2:2020cv01437
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 37 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lockwood, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Filing 36 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Ergo, Richard)
July 17, 2020 Filing 35 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
July 17, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of NONCOMPLIANCE With Electronic Filing Requirement (Local Rule 135(g)): Attorney Richard Ergo is directed to register for CM/ECF. (Sant Agata, S)
July 17, 2020 Filing 33 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-03330.
July 16, 2020 case electronically transmitted to the Eastern District of California. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #19 Motion to Change Venue. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE hearing set for July 24, 2020 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. The motion will be determined on the briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 30 PIONEER OIL, LLC, ET AL's ANSWER to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint of Jason Chen filed by Tad Butt, Denhan Enterprises, Inc., Pioneer Oil, LLC, Bryan Stromberg. (Lockwood, Robert) (Filed on 6/29/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY (re #19 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue for Convenience filed by Tad Butt, Denhan Enterprises, Inc., Pioneer Oil, LLC, Bryan Stromberg. (Lockwood, Robert) (Filed on 6/23/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE HEARING set for July 10, 2020 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Motion Hearing reset for 7/24/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Charles R. Breyer. The matter will be set for a Zoom conference. The Zoom Clerk's Notice will be posted on the docket at a later date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear by Telephone - APPLICATION FOR A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Tad Butt, Denhan Enterprises, Inc., Pioneer Oil, LLC, Bryan Stromberg. (Lockwood, Robert) (Filed on 6/19/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE t (re #19 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue for Convenience) - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FOR CONVENIENCE BY DEFENDANTS PIONEER OIL, LLC, TAD BUTT, BRYAN STROMBERG AND DENHAN ENTERPRISES, INC. filed by Jason Chen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration B. Christine Park, #2 Declaration Nishith Kumar, #3 Declaration Kathy Trujillo, #4 Declaration Jason Chen, #5 Proposed Order)(Ergo, Richard) (Filed on 6/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 25 Summons on First Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendants Tad Butt, Denhan Enterprises, Inc., Matrix Supply & Distribution Limited, Pioneer Oil, LLC, Kevin Santos-Buch, Bryan Stromberg, Trade Group Asia Limited. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 24 Proposed Summons. (Ergo, Richard) (Filed on 6/8/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 23 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jason Chen as to All Defendants. (Ergo, Richard) (Filed on 6/8/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ERRATA re: Name of Defendant Matrix Supply & Distribution Limited to re #10 First Amended Complaint for Damages - [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #21] filed by Jason Chen. (Ergo, Richard) (Filed on 6/8/2020) Modified on 6/8/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jason Chen. Amendment to #10 Amended Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET #10 . (Ergo, Richard) (Filed on 6/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jason Chen. Amendment to #12 Proposed Summons CORRECTION OF DOCKET #12 . (Ergo, Richard) (Filed on 6/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 19 Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue for Convenience; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Tad Butt, Denhan Enterprises, Inc., Pioneer Oil, LLC, Bryan Stromberg. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 6/16/2020. Replies due by 6/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Tad Butt, #2 Declaration Declaration of Bryan Stromberg, #3 Declaration Declaration of Robert I. Lockwood, #4 [Proposed] Order)(Lockwood, Robert) (Filed on 6/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2020 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jason Chen.. (Ergo, Richard) (Filed on 5/29/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 Exhibits to re #10 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Damages filed by Jason Chen. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Ergo, Richard) (Filed on 5/29/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Tad Butt, Denhan Enterprises, Inc., Matix Supply & Distribution Limited, Pioneer Oil, LLC, Kevin Santos-Buch, Bryan Stromberg, Trade Group Asia Limited. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. (Ergo, Richard) (Filed on 5/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 28, 2020 #Electronic filing error. [err201] Please make the Following Corrections to the Summons and Re-submit. Please Remove "Amended" from the Title and "Does 1 though 20 " in the To: portion of the Summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #9 Proposed Summons filed by Jason Chen. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jason Chen. (Ergo, Richard) (Filed on 5/27/2020) Modified on 5/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (with jury demand) against All Defendants. Filed by Jason Chen. (Ergo, Richard) (Filed on 5/27/2020) Modified on 5/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Ergo, Richard) (Filed on 5/27/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tad Butt, Denhan Enterprises, Inc., Pioneer Oil, LLC, Bryan Stromberg.. (Lockwood, Robert) (Filed on 5/27/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 DEFENDANTS' CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF CONSENTING TO THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE (BROCHURE) by Tad Butt, Denhan Enterprises, Inc., Pioneer Oil, LLC, Bryan Stromberg. (Lockwood, Robert) (Filed on 5/18/2020) Modified on 5/19/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 DEFENDANTS' CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF STANDING ORDERS, ET AL. by Tad Butt, Denhan Enterprises, Inc., Pioneer Oil, LLC, Bryan Stromberg. (Lockwood, Robert) (Filed on 5/18/2020) Modified on 5/19/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)[Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/1/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRYAN STROMBERG, TAD BUTT, DENHAN ENTERPRISES, INC., PIONEER OIL, LLC (Lockwood, Robert) (Filed on 5/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by BRYAN STROMBERG, TAD BUTT, DENHAN ENTERPRISES, INC., PIONEER OIL, LLC (Lockwood, Robert) (Filed on 5/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (with jury demand by plaintiff) from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-20-584008. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14476487). Filed by BRYAN STROMBERG, TAD BUTT, PIONEER OIL, LLC, DENHAN ENTERPRISES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Adverse Party, #2 Declaration of Robert Lockwood, #3 Declaration of Byran Stromberg, #4 Declaration of Tad Butt, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lockwood, Robert) (Filed on 5/15/2020) Modified on 5/18/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Pioneer Oil, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Santos-Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trade Group Asia Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Oil, LLC
Represented By: Robert Irving Lockwood
Represented By: Joseph Richard Lordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Stromberg
Represented By: Robert Irving Lockwood
Represented By: Joseph Richard Lordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denhan Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Irving Lockwood
Represented By: Joseph Richard Lordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix Supply & Distribution Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tad Butt
Represented By: Robert Irving Lockwood
Represented By: Joseph Richard Lordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Chen
Represented By: Richard A. Ergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?