(SS) Hensley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Teresa M. Hensley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv01448
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coder, Ellinor)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 10/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE (text only); Parties are notified that #5 Social Security New Case Documents shall be DISREGARDED. Amended New Case documents to follow. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 [DISREGARDED] SEE #7 ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 10/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Mena-Sanchez, L) Modified on 7/21/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jared Thomas Walker* *Law Office of Jared T. Walker, PC* *P.O. Box 1777* *Orangevale, CA 95662*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/21/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the scheduling order in Social Security cases; Within 14 days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall submit to the USM, an original and five copies of the completed summons, five copies of the complaint, five copies of the scheduling order, and a completed USM-285 form. (cc: USM) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 20, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Benson, A.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Teresa M. Hensley. (Walker, Jared)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Teresa M. Hensley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Hensley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ellinor Ravenel Coder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa M. Hensley
Represented By: Jared Thomas Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?