(SS) Mills v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Crystal Anne Mills
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv01449
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 11/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Coll, A)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Robert Weems* *769 Center Blvd.* *PMB 38* *Fairfax, CA 94930*. (Coll, A)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/6/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the necessary documents and file a statement with the court. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs within 60 days from the date of this order. The parties are hereby NOTIFIED that, after service of the complaint, this action will be STAYED pursuant to General Order Number 615, and there will be no scheduling order or deadlines in effect pending further order of the court. (Coll, A)
July 20, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Benson, A.)
July 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Crystal Anne Mills. (Weems, Robert)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Crystal Anne Mills. Attorney Weems, Robert added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weems, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Mills v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Anne Mills
Represented By: Robert Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?