(SS) Sullivan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gina Nicole Sullivan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv01450
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/2/2020. (Kaminski, H)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Gina Nicole Sullivan pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/07/2020 DIRECTING the Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing within 14 days, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff's filing of a statement that the USM has been provided the required documents will be deemed good cause shown. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the case will be dismissed. (Tupolo, A)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 10/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare Street, Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/21/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. Within fourteen days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall submit to the USM a completed summons and copies of the complaint and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. The Clerk is directed to issue the Consent/Decline forms only. Pursuant to G.O. 615, no Briefing Schedule shall issue. (cc: USM) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 20, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Benson, A.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Gina Nicole Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Gina Nicole Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Sullivan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Nicole Sullivan
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?