EL & EL Wood Products Corp. v. Copado
Plaintiff: EL & EL Wood Products Corp.
Defendant: Ernesto Copado
Case Number: 2:2020cv01500
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Minute Order served on Ernesto Copado. (Donati, J)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: On August 17, 2020, Defendant filed a pleading in propria persona. See ECF No. 8. However, he advises he is seeking counsel. Id. Defendant has thirty (30) days from the date of this order to find counsel. The Court hereby STAYS this action during this time. If Defendants counsel does not file a notice of appearance within thirty (30) days, the case will be referred to Magistrate Judge Delaney. See E.D. Cal. L.R. 302(c)(21). IT IS SO ORDERED. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and find a Lawyer by Ernesto Copado. (Becknal, R)
August 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Minute Order served on Ernesto Copado. (Streeter, J)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/18/2020: Defendant's motion for an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. #8 ) is GRANTED. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6, and good cause appearing, defendant shall have an additional 21 days from the date of this order to respond to plaintiff's complaint. (Streeter, J)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ernesto Copado served on 7/29/2020. (Tate, Drew) Modified on 8/19/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to respond re #1 Complaint, by Ernesto Copado. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Tate, Drew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Alden John Parker on behalf of EL & EL Wood Products Corp. Attorney Parker, Alden John added. (Parker, Alden)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ernesto Copado* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Drew M. Tate* *Fisher & Phillips LLP* *621 Capitol Mall, Suite 1400* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Benson, A.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff EL & EL Wood Products Corp. (Tate, Drew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Temporary, Preliminary, and Injunctive Relief and Damages against Defendant by EL & EL Wood Products Corp. Attorney Tate, Drew M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9016043) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tate, Drew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EL & EL Wood Products Corp. v. Copado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto Copado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EL & EL Wood Products Corp.
Represented By: Drew M. Tate
Represented By: Alden John Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?