(SS) Rania v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Richard Rania
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv01541
Filed: August 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-01541-MCE-CKD. (Tupolo, A)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION: DISREGARD (#9) Consent Minute Order. Issued in error. (Tupolo, A)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 [DISREGARD per (#10) NOTICE]CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/29/2020, Nunc Pro Tunc 09/26/2020: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 2:20-cv-01541-CKD (SS). (Tupolo, A) Modified on 9/29/2020 (Tupolo, A).
September 26, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Chermol, David)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Talbert, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/10/2020 ADDING attorney David F. Chermol, PHV for Richard Rania. (Huang, H)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Richard Rania for attorney David F. Chermol to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9041346) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Zane, Helen)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/03/2020: The parties are hereby notified that, after service of the complaint, this action will be stayed pursuant to General Order Number 615, and there will be no scheduling order or deadlines in effect pending further order of the court. See E.D. Cal. G.O. No. 615, Paragraphs 6,10. The Clerk is directed to issue the Consent/Decline forms only. Pursuant to General Order Number 615, no Briefing Schedule shall issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Streeter, J)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 11/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Benson, A.)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Helen R. Zane* *Law Offices of Helen R. Zane* *P.O. Box 1126* *Arcata, CA 95518*. (Benson, A.)
August 2, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Richard Rania. Attorney Zane, Helen R. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9030444) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zane, Helen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Rania v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rania
Represented By: Helen R. Zane
Represented By: David F. Chermol, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?