(PC) David Roberts v. CSP - SAC et al
Plaintiff: David Nathaniel Roberts
Defendant: Jeff Lynch, Darling, CSP - SAC, Konrad and Adaza
Case Number: 2:2020cv01564
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for David Nathaniel Roberts, CDC BA-0958 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
August 6, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on David Nathaniel Roberts. (Rivera, O)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 9/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Rivera, O)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-05578.
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. See order for further details. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb) [Transferred from cacd on 8/6/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/6/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by plaintiff David Roberts. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/6/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants Adaza, CSP - SAC, Darling, Konrad, Jeff Lynch pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, filed by plaintiff David Roberts. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) David Roberts v. CSP - SAC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSP - SAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Nathaniel Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?