Stampfli v. Susanville Sanitary District et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Stampfli
Defendant: Marty Heath, David French, Kim Erb, John Murray, Susanville Sanitary District, Steve J. Stump and Ernie Peters
Case Number: 2:2020cv01566
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Flautt, Kevin)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Flautt, Kevin)
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to DISMISS by Kim Erb, et al., Attorney Flautt, Kevin A. added. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2020 at 01:30 PM before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flautt, Kevin)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Steve J. Stump served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Beko, Thomas)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Marty Heath served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Beko, Thomas)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Kim Erb served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Beko, Thomas)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: David French served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Beko, Thomas)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ernie Peters served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Beko, Thomas)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: John Murray served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Beko, Thomas)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Susanville Sanitary District served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Beko, Thomas)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kim Erb, David French, Marty Heath, John Murray, Ernie Peters, Steve J. Stump, Susanville Sanitary District* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas Peter Beko* *Erickson, Thorpe & Swainston, Ltd.* *99 W. Arroyo Street* *Reno, NV 89590*. (Benson, A.)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Deborah Stampfli (Beko, Thomas)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Deborah Stampfli. Attorney Beko, Thomas Peter added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9039091) (Beko, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stampfli v. Susanville Sanitary District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Heath
Represented By: Kevin A. Flautt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David French
Represented By: Kevin A. Flautt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Erb
Represented By: Kevin A. Flautt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Murray
Represented By: Kevin A. Flautt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susanville Sanitary District
Represented By: Kevin A. Flautt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve J. Stump
Represented By: Kevin A. Flautt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernie Peters
Represented By: Kevin A. Flautt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Stampfli
Represented By: Thomas Peter Beko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?