Whiteside v. SPSG Partners et al
Plaintiff: Stephon Whiteside
Defendant: Goodfellow Bros. California, LLC, SPSG Partners, Pacific States Environmental Contractors, Inc., SPSG Partners, LLC, Sukut Construction, Inc. and Sukut Construction, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01643
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/8/2020: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and for Attorney Fees (ECF No. #5 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 10/15/2020 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY by Stephon Whiteside re #9 Opposition to Motion,. (Shimoda, Galen)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 OPPOSITION by Goodfellow Bros. CA, LLC, Pacific States Environmental Contractors, Inc., SPSG Partners, SPSG Partners, LLC, Sukut Construction, Inc., Sukut Construction, LLC. to #5 Motion to Remand, Motion for Attorney Fees. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mia A. Lomedico, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Dauscher, Scott) Modified on 10/5/2020 (Reader, L).
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Scott K. Dauscher on behalf of Goodfellow Bros. California, LLC, Pacific States Environmental Contractors, Inc., SPSG Partners, SPSG Partners, LLC, Sukut Construction, Inc., Sukut Construction, LLC.. Attorney Dauscher, Scott K. added. (Dauscher, Scott)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Renald Konini,Jessica Lynne Hart for Stephon Whiteside. (Hart, Jessica)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER re #5 Motion to Remand and Motion for Attorney Fees. (Shimoda, Galen) Modified on 9/14/2020 (York, M).
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to REMAND and MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES by Stephon Whiteside. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibits) (Shimoda, Galen) Modified on 9/14/2020 (York, M).
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of #2 Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order by SPSG Partners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibt A)(Lomedico, Mia) Modified on 8/24/2020 (Huang, H).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE of Notice to Adverse Party by SPSG Partners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lomedico, Mia) Modified on 8/19/2020 (York, M).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Butte County Superior Court, case number 20CV00090 by SPSG Partners. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9056058) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Michael Crawford, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate of Service)(Lomedico, Mia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whiteside v. SPSG Partners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephon Whiteside
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Represented By: Renald Konini
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodfellow Bros. California, LLC
Represented By: Mia Angelina Lomedico
Represented By: Scott K. Dauscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPSG Partners
Represented By: Mia Angelina Lomedico
Represented By: Scott K. Dauscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific States Environmental Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Mia Angelina Lomedico
Represented By: Scott K. Dauscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPSG Partners, LLC
Represented By: Mia Angelina Lomedico
Represented By: Scott K. Dauscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukut Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Mia Angelina Lomedico
Represented By: Scott K. Dauscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukut Construction, LLC.
Represented By: Scott K. Dauscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?