(PC) Hill v. Newsome et al
Plaintiff: Cymeyon Hill
Defendant: Newsome and CDCR
Case Number: 2:2020cv01652
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #10 by Plaintiff Cymeyon Hill. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 30, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order, Findings and Recommendations, #9 Order served on Cymeyon Hill. (Yin, K)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/29/2020 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 request to proceed ifp; and the Clerk shall appoint a district judge to this action. IT IS RECOMMENDED this action be dismissed. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/29/2020 VACATING the 9/25/2020 #7 order finding that plaintiff is obligated to pay the filing fee. The Clerk shall serve this order on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #2 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
September 25, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, served on Cymeyon Hill. (Plummer, M)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 [VACATED PURSUANT TO #9 ORDER] ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Cymeyon Hill signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/25/20. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M) Modified on 9/30/2020 (Yin, K).
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Cymeyon Hill. (Zignago, K.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Cymeyon Hill, CDC V-53300 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
August 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Cymeyon Hill. (Kastilahn, A)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Kastilahn, A)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Cymeyon Hill. (Kastilahn, A)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Cymeyon Hill.(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Hill v. Newsome et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cymeyon Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?