(HC) Demos v. Governor of Washington et al
Petitioner: John R. Demos, Jr.
Respondent: Governor of Washington and Governor of California
Case Number: 2:2020cv01653
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gregory G Hollows
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 OTHER COURT CASE NUMBER from Eastern District of Washington case number 4:20-cv-05170. (Gonzalez, R)
September 22, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on John R. Demos Jr. (Henshaw, R)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/22/2020 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington. (Henshaw, R)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (York, M)
August 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on John R. Demos Jr.. (Zignago, K.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Zignago, K.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by John R. Demos, Jr. (Zignago, K.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Governor of California, Governor of Washington by John R. Demos, Jr. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Demos v. Governor of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Governor of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Governor of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John R. Demos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?