(SS) Pinkard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Aaron Frank Pinkard
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv01655
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/15/2020: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 2:20-cv-01655-JDP (SS). (Tupolo, A)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Forslund, Jacqueline)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Edmund F. Brennan* to *Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson* for all further proceedings. As of October 1, 2020, Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson is reassigned to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California. (Donati, J)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Aaron Frank Pinkard. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/1/2020. (Tupolo, A)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coder, Ellinor)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 [DISREGARD-COUNSEL TO REFILE WITH CAPTION PAGE] NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to USM by Aaron Frank Pinkard.(Forslund, Jacqueline) Modified on 8/27/2020 (Tupolo, A).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 11/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Huang, H)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jacqueline Anna Forslund* *Forslund Law LLC* *P.O. Box 4476* *Sunriver, OR 97707*. (Huang, H)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/19/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the necessary documents and file a statement with the court. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs within 60 days from the date of this order. The parties are hereby NOTIFIED that, after service of the complaint, this action will be STAYED pursuant to General Order Number 615, and there will be no scheduling order or deadlines in effect pending further order of the court. (Huang, H)
August 18, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Becknal, R)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Aaron Frank Pinkard. (Forslund, Jacqueline)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Aaron Frank Pinkard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forslund, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Pinkard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Frank Pinkard
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ellinor Ravenel Coder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?