(SS) Altes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Beth K. Altes
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv01663
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/18/2020: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 2:20-cv-01663-KJN. (Zignago, K.)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Illarmo, Marcelo)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Haley, Denise)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Beth K. Altes. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haley, Denise)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Coll, A)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Denise Bourgeois Haley* *12631 East Imperial Highway* *Suite C-115* *Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670*. (Coll, A)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/20/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM all necessary documents to effectuate service on the defendant. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process no later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Coll, A)
August 19, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Benson, A.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Beth K. Altes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haley, Denise)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Beth K. Altes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of interested parties, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haley, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Altes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth K. Altes
Represented By: Denise Bourgeois Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Marcelo N. Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?