(PC)Uhuru v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Kohen Diallo E. Uhuru
Defendant: R. Singh, C. Brown, Karla Solis, B. Michels, Michael Scamurra, Kim Petersen and A. Chaudhry
Case Number: 2:2020cv01664
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #7 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
October 9, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, #11 Order and Findings and Recommendations, and the form for a civil rights complaint by a prisoner served on Kohen Diallo E. Uhuru. (Henshaw, R)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/8/2020 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kohen Diallo E. Uhuru. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/8/2020 GRANTING #7 Motion to Proceed IFP; VACATING #8 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel; DISMISSING Plaintiff's claims against defendant Scamurra with leave to amend within 30 days; and RECOMMENDING all claims in Plaintiff's complaint, but for the claim alleging inadequate dental care against defendant Scamurra, be dismissed on the grounds that they are improperly joined. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. (Henshaw, R)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Kohen Diallo E. Uhuru. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 10/2/2020 (Plummer, M).
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #8 by Plaintiff Kohen Diallo E. Uhuru. (Kastilahn, A)
September 17, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Findings and Recommendations served on Kohen Diallo E. Uhuru. (Henshaw, R)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 [VACATED PER #11 ORDER] FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/16/2020 RECOMMENDING #7 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be denied and Plaintiff be ordered to pay the $400 filing fee within 30 days of the adoption of these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R) Modified on 10/9/2020 (Henshaw, R).
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kohen Diallo E. Uhuru. (Coll, A)
September 2, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Kohen Diallo E. Uhuru. (Kastilahn, A)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-1664 TLN KJN (PC). (Kastilahn, A)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
August 24, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP application served on Kohen Diallo E. Uhuru. (Henshaw, R)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/21/2020 DISMISSING without prejudice #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed application to proceed IFP. (Henshaw, R)
August 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kohen Diallo E. Uhuru. (Reader, L)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Reader, L)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kohen Diallo E. Uhuru. (Reader, L)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against C. Brown, A. Chaudhry, B. Michels, Kim Petersen, Michael Scamurra, R. Singh, Karla Solis by Kohen Diallo E. Uhuru.(Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Uhuru v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Michels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scamurra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Chaudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kohen Diallo E. Uhuru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?