(PC) Driver v. Kern County Superior Court et al
Plaintiff: Billy Driver, Jr
Defendant: John S. Somers, Kern County Superior Court, R. Bansal, W. Kushner, Maya and Pract
Case Number: 2:2020cv01665
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Billy Driver, Jr.(Kastilahn, A)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Amendment of Complaint by Billy Driver, Jr., re #9 Order. (Kastilahn, A)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #6 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
September 15, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order and #10 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Billy Driver Jr. (Henshaw, R)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/14/2020 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Billy Driver, Jr. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/14/2020 GRANTING #6 Motion to Proceed IFP; DISMISSING #1 Complaint; and ORDERING Plaintiff to complete the attached Notice of Amendment and submit it with an original and one copy of the Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. (Henshaw, R)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Billy Driver, Jr. (Zignago, K.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Billy Driver, Jr, CDC D-35391 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Billy Driver, Jr. (Zignago, K.)
September 2, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Billy Driver, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-1665 JAM KJN (PC). (Kastilahn, A)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
August 24, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and IFP application served on Billy Driver Jr. (Henshaw, R)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/21/2020 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP on the form provided by the Clerk or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. (Henshaw, R)
August 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Billy Driver Jr. (York, M)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (York, M)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Billy Driver, Jr. (York, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Driver v. Kern County Superior Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bansal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pract
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Driver, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?