Martinez v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Mary Helen Martinez
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01666
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy L. Kennison for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The court is in receipt of the parties Joint Statement of the Pending Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. #64 , where parties agree Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. #51 , is ready to be adjudicated by the court. The court grants Boston Scientific's request to file a Reply with the court ten (10) days from this order. On the court's own motion, the Motion Hearing as to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. #51 is set for 12/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Court Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry)(Kennison, L)
September 23, 2020 Filing 64 JOINT STATEMENT of the Pending Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation re Minute Order (ECF No. 63).(O'Reilly, Theodore) Modified on 9/24/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
September 9, 2020 Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of the transfer of the case from Multi-District Litigation to this court, the court now ORDERS the parties to file a joint statement of no more than five pages within fourteen (14) days addressing whether the pending Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. #51 , is ripe for adjudication. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
September 3, 2020 Filing 62 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Jon A. Strongman, PHV; Michael A. Tanenbaum, NCAED; Eric M. Anielak, NCAED and James H. Keale, NCAED terminated (O'Reilly, Theodore)
August 31, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of attorney Michael Bonasso, NCAED for Boston Scientific Corporation. [Filed in Noncompliance] (Huang, H)
August 26, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sheila M. Bossier, PHV on behalf of Mary Helen Martinez. (Bossier, Sheila)
August 24, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Theodore O'Reilly on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. Attorney O'Reilly, Theodore added. (O'Reilly, Theodore)
August 24, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Tarifa Belle Laddon on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. Attorney Laddon, Tarifa Belle added. (Laddon, Tarifa)
August 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #56 Civil New Case Documents for KJM, #57 Docket Annotation, served on Eric M. Anielak NCAED, Michael Bonasso NCAED, James H. Keale NCAED, Jon A. Strongman PHV, Michael A. Tanenbaum NCAED. (Marrujo, C)
August 19, 2020 Filing 57 CLERK'S NOTICE to ALL Attorneys: If you are not admitted to practice in the Eastern District of California and are part of the California State Bar, you will need to submit the Petition for Admission of ECF Registration and pay the $200.00 fee. If you will be practicing as Pro Hac Vice, you will need to submit the Pro Hac Vice Application and pay the $225.00 fee. (Attachments: #1 PHV Instructions and Application) (Marrujo, C)
August 19, 2020 Filing 56 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
August 19, 2020 Filing 55 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-07208.
August 18, 2020 Filing 54 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 7153 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 5 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 8077 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Badylak, #8 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak, #9 Exhibit ECF 8142 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Badylak, #10 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #11 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #12 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 8088 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Little, #14 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 1, #15 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 2, #16 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 3, #17 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 4, #18 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 5, #19 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Little, #20 Exhibit ECF 8141 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Little, #21 Exhibit ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #22 Exhibit ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #23 Exhibit ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little, #24 Exhibit ECF 8074 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Rosenblatt, #25 Exhibit ECF 4833 - Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt and Memo in Support, #26 Exhibit ECF 8140 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Rosenblatt, #27 Exhibit ECF 4978 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt, #28 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh A, #29 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh B, #30 Exhibit ECF 5039 - Pltf_s Reply Brief in Support of MTE Rosenblatt, #31 Exhibit ECF 6047 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Dr. P. Rosenblatt, #32 Exhibit ECF 8076 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Spiegelberg, #33 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo re Spiegelberg, #34 Exhibit ECF 4827 - Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg and Memo in Support, #35 Exhibit ECF 8149 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Spiegelberg, #36 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #37 Exhibit ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #38 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #39 Exhibit ECF 5031 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #40 Exhibit ECF 6049 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Spiegelberg, #41 Exhibit ECF 8066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Mays, #42 Exhibit ECF 4805 - BSC_s Memo in Support of MTE Mays, #43 Exhibit ECF 8119 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Mays, #44 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 1, #45 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 2, #46 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 3, #47 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 4, #48 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 5, #49 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 6, #50 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 7, #51 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 8, #52 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 9, #53 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 10, #54 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays, #55 Exhibit ECF 8165 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pltf_s Memo in Opp to MTE Mays, #56 Exhibit ECF 5037 - BSC_s Reply to Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays, #57 Exhibit ECF 6036 - Memo Opinion and Order Mays, #58 Exhibit ECF 8071 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Pence, #59 Exhibit ECF 4815 - BSC_s MTE Pence and Memo in Support, #60 Exhibit ECF 8111 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, #61 Exhibit ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Pence, #62 Exhibit ECF 8166 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, #63 Exhibit ECF 5038 - BSC_s Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, #64 Exhibit ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Pence, #65 Exhibit ECF 8084 - BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig, #66 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh A, #67 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B1, #68 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B2, #69 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B3, #70 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B4, #71 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh C, #72 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh D, #73 Exhibit ECF 8117 - Pltf_s Response and Memo in Opp to BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig, #74 Exhibit ECF 8164 - BSC_s Reply in Support of MTE Rosenzweig, #75 Exhibit ECF 6039 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Rosenzweig, #76 Exhibit ECF 216 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #77 Exhibit ECF 275 - BSC_s Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #78 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh A, #79 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh B, #80 Exhibit ECF 473 - Amended Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions))(Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/19/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/18/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/5/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE by Mary Helen Martinez in opposition to #51 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying #49 MOTION by Mary Helen Martinez to Extend Time to Complete Discovery to June 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION by Mary Helen Martinez to Extend Time to Complete Discovery Deadline Contained in Pretrial Order No. 196 to Obtain the Deposition of Kenneth Royle, M.D. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Friends and Family on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 47 OBJECTIONS by Mary Helen Martinez to Defendant's #38 Notice of Deposition of Dr. Himanshu Aggarwal and Motion for Protective Order (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Crystal muradanes on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Mary Muradanes on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Anthony Martinez on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Samantha Tate on TBd at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Desiree Martinez on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Roseann Becker on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 40 OBJECTIONS to Defendant's #37 Notice of Deposition of Dr. Richard Liles and MOTION by Mary Helen Martinez for Protective Order (Bossier, Sheila) (Modified on 4/12/2019 to add motion for Protective Order)(slr). [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 39 OBJECTIONS to Defendant's #35 Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum by Mary Helen Martinez (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Himanshu Aggarwal on April 24, 2019 at 5:30 p.m. (EDT) (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Richard Liles on April 15, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (EDT) (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Mary Helen Martinez of Dr. Kenneth Royle on April 29, 2019 at 9:00 am (PST) (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 35 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Mary Martinez on April 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 34 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Mary Martinez on April 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 33 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Mary Martinez on April 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Helen Martinez for Supplemental Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Mary Martinez on February 19, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 30 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Mary Martinez on February 19, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Responses to Interrogatories, Request for Production and Request for Admissions. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/NOTICE OF SERVICE by Mary Helen Martinez for Response to First Interrogatories and Response to First Set of Requests for Production of Documents. (Bossier, Sheila) (Modified on 1/22/2019 to convert event to certificate of service)(rmc). [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Interrogatories and Request for Production. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Mary Helen Martinez for Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Mary Helen Martinez of Philip Stypula on a date and at a time to be determined but no later than April 29, 2019. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Mary Helen Martinez on January 29, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Shlomo Raz, MD on January 15, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Kenneth M. Royle, MD on January 14, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Plaintiff Fact Sheet Deficiency Letter. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDER # 196 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 5 Cases) The cases on Exhibits A are: 1.) removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2.) placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1.) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2.) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Boston Scientific Corporation, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3.) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and 4.) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 5 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES. The following deadlines shall apply in all BSC Wave 5 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 11/15/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due 11/22/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due 12/21/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 02/22/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 03/22/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 03/29/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 04/29/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 05/13/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 06/03/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 05/13/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 06/03/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3.) Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 03/25/2019, and any response is due by 04/09/2019. Any reply is due by 04/15/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Civil Rule 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1.) Venue Recommendations. By no later than 04/06/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 04/13/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/31/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 5 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF FRIENDS AND FAMILY by Boston Scientific Corporation of all friends and family members identified in the Plaintiff Fact Sheet, including section VI. Fact Witnesses, and/or identified during the Plaintiffs deposition including but not limited to Roseanne Becker, Desiree Martinez, Samantha Tate, Anthony Martinez, Mary Muradanes, Crystal Muradanes on dates and at times to be determined. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Sheila M. Bossier on behalf of Mary Helen Martinez. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Rule 26 Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Reinstate; the Clerk is DIRECTED to remove the inactive docket flag and reinstate this case to the active docket. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/25/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (brn) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Helen Martinez for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Rueb, Gregory) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Mary Helen Martinez to Reinstate to Active Docket (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit)(Rueb, Gregory) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Boston Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Boston Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Boston Inactive") (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Boston Scientific Corporation have reached a settlement with regard to BSC. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and BSC may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5297 in MDL Case No. 2326 Boston. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/4/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Gregory David Rueb updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Mary Helen Martinez. (Rueb, Gregory) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 7 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Mary Helen Martinez. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(Rueb, Gregory) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mks) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
May 2, 2014 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon Strongman on 4/30/14. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 2/25/2014, answer due 4/28/2014. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
May 2, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 18, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
February 19, 2014 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 77 (SHOW CAUSE ORDER RE: MOTION TO APPOINT LIEN RESOLUTION ADMINISTRATOR) entered on 02/18/2014 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (sak) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
February 3, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2969169. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sak) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman, PHV
Represented By: James H. Keale, NCAED
Represented By: Michael Bonasso, NCAED
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum, NCAED
Represented By: Eric M. Anielak, NCAED
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Helen Martinez
Represented By: Sheila M. Bossier, PHV
Represented By: Gregory David Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?