(HC) Pilman v. Fisher
Petitioner: Gerald Pilman
Respondent: R. Fisher
Case Number: 2:2020cv01771
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, and prisoner IFP form served on Gerald Pilman. (Plummer, M)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/19/20 ORDERING Petitioner shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the certification required by Rule 3(a)(2), or pay the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Petitioner a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Plummer, M)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Zignago, K.)
October 2, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Gerald Pilman. (Coll, A)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-1771-WBS-DMC. (Coll, A)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
September 4, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Gerald Pilman. (Tupolo, A)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Tupolo, A)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Gerald Pilman by R. Fisher. (Tupolo, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Pilman v. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerald Pilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?