Naiman v. Clarity Diagnostics, LLC
Plaintiff: Sidney Naiman
Defendant: Clarity Diagnostics, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01920
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 CASE DISMISSED in its entirety, without prejudice, pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). See #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. CASE CLOSED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Sidney Naiman. (Friedman, Todd)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Clarity Diagnostics, LLC served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Friedman, Todd)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Clarity Diagnostics, LLC. (Friedman, Todd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Friedman, Todd)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Clarity Diagnostics, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Todd M. Friedman* *Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.* *21550 Oxnard St., Suite 780* *Woodland Hills, CA 91367*. (Benson, A.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clarity Diagnostics, LLC by Sidney Naiman. Attorney Friedman, Todd M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9139341) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naiman v. Clarity Diagnostics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Naiman
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarity Diagnostics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?