Naiman et al v. Millennial Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Sidney Naiman and Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc.
Defendant: Millennial Solutions, LLC Doing business as Global Business Lending
Case Number: 2:2020cv01921
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Millennial Solutions, LLC. (Friedman, Todd)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Millennial Solutions, LLC. (Friedman, Todd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Friedman, Todd)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Millennial Solutions, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Todd M. Friedman* *Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.* *21550 Oxnard St., Suite 780* *Woodland Hills, CA 91367*. (Benson, A.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Millennial Solutions LLC by Sidney Naiman, Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc.. Attorney Friedman, Todd M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9139355) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naiman et al v. Millennial Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Naiman
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc.
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennial Solutions, LLC Doing business as Global Business Lending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?