Yoshida v. Vista Energy Marketing, et al
Plaintiff: Monica Yoshida
Defendant: Ranslem Capital LP, Michael Whalen, Vista Energy Marketing LP, Whale Family Investments LP, David Ranslem, Kenny McGuffey, Rethink Direct Inc., Irish Marketing LLC and Travis Smth
Case Number: 2:2020cv01944
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Monica Yoshida. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Balsam, Daniel)
November 25, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY by Whale Family Investments LP re #18 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fullmer, Toby)
November 25, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE by Vista Energy Marketing LP to #26 Objections. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Capritta, Leah)
November 25, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY by Vista Energy Marketing LP re #18 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Capritta, Leah)
November 25, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY by Vista Energy Marketing LP re #17 Motion to Compel,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Capritta, Leah)
November 24, 2020 Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/24/2020: On the Court's own motion, Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. #17 , #18 and #19 ) are hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 12/3/2020 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. Reply briefs may still be filed in accordance with Local Rule 230(d) and the 12/3/2020 date. (Text Only Entry) (Krueger, M)
November 20, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Rethink Direct Inc. served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Balsam, Daniel)
November 19, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Michael Whalen served on 8/31/2020. (Balsam, Daniel) Modified on 11/20/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 19, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: David Ranslem served on 8/31/2020. (Balsam, Daniel) Modified on 11/20/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 19, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Whale Family Investments LP served on 9/1/2020. (Balsam, Daniel) Modified on 11/20/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 19, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ranslem Capital LP served on 8/31/2020. (Balsam, Daniel) Modified on 11/20/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 19, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Irish Marketing LLC served on 8/31/2020. (Balsam, Daniel) Modified on 11/20/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 19, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Vista Energy Marketing LP served on 8/31/2020. (Balsam, Daniel) Modified on 11/20/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 19, 2020 Filing 26 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Monica Yoshida to #19 Motion to Dismiss, #18 Motion to Dismiss, #17 Motion to Compel Arbitration. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Balsam, Daniel) Modified on 11/20/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 19, 2020 Filing 25 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Monica Yoshida in re #24 Opposition to Motion. (Balsam, Daniel)
November 19, 2020 Filing 24 OPPOSITION by Monica Yoshida to #19 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Balsam, Daniel)
November 19, 2020 Filing 23 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Monica Yoshida in re #22 Opposition to Motion. (Balsam, Daniel)
November 19, 2020 Filing 22 OPPOSITION by Monica Yoshida to #18 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Balsam, Daniel)
November 19, 2020 Filing 21 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Monica Yoshida in re #20 Opposition to Motion. (Balsam, Daniel)
November 19, 2020 Filing 20 OPPOSITION by Monica Yoshida to #17 Motion to Compel,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Balsam, #2 Proof of Service)(Balsam, Daniel)
October 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to DISMISS by Vista Energy Marketing LP. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Leah Capritta, #3 Declaration of Boyd Eirksen, #4 Proof of Service)(Capritta, Leah)
October 30, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to DISMISS by Whale Family Investments LP. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Fullmer, Toby)
October 30, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration by Vista Energy Marketing LP. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Capritta, Leah)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/5/2020 ADDING attorney Toby B. Fullmer, PHV for David Ranslem, Ranslem Capital LP, Whale Family Investments LP, and Michael Whalen. (Huang, H)
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by David Ranslem, Ranslem Capital LP, Whale Family Investments LP, Michael Whalen for attorney Toby B. Fullmer to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kern, John P. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9160616) (Kern, John)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/5/2020 ORDERING Defendants Vista Energy Marketing, L.P., Irish Marketing LLC, together with Ranslem Capital LP, Whale Family Investments LP, David Ranslem, and Michael Whalen will answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before 10/31/2020. (Zignago, K.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint by Irish Marketing LLC, Vista Energy Marketing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Capritta, Leah) Modified on 10/5/2020 (Kaminski, H).
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/30/2020. Added attorney Thomas D. Leland, PHV for Irish Marketing LLC and Vista Energy Marketing LP. (Coll, A)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/30/2020. Added attorney Leah E. Capritta, PHV for Irish Marketing LLC and Vista Energy Marketing LP. (Coll, A)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Irish Marketing LLC, Vista Energy Marketing LP re #4 Civil New Case Documents for TLN. (Kern, John) Modified on 9/30/2020 (Reader, L).
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Irish Marketing LLC, Vista Energy Marketing LP re #4 Civil New Case Documents for TLN. (Kern, John) Modified on 9/30/2020 (Reader, L).
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE #4 by Irish Marketing LLC, Vista Energy Marketing LP. (Agius, Rachel) Modified on 9/30/2020 (Reader, L).
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE #4 by Irish Marketing LLC, Vista Energy Marketing LP. (Kern, John) Modified on 9/30/2020 (Reader, L).
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Irish Marketing LLC, Vista Energy Marketing LP for attorney Thomas D. Leland to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9147184) (Kern, John)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Irish Marketing LLC, Vista Energy Marketing LP for attorney Leah E. Capritta to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9147157) (Kern, John)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) Modified on 9/29/2020 (Benson, A.).
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Irish Marketing LLC, Vista Energy Marketing LP re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Kern, John)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Irish Marketing LLC, Vista Energy Marketing LP (Kern, John)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2020-00277762 by Vista Energy Marketing and Irish Marketing LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9144731) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Kern, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yoshida v. Vista Energy Marketing, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranslem Capital LP
Represented By: John P. Kern
Represented By: Toby B. Fullmer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Whalen
Represented By: John P. Kern
Represented By: Toby B. Fullmer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vista Energy Marketing LP
Represented By: John P. Kern
Represented By: Rachel C. Agius
Represented By: Thomas D. Leland, PHV
Represented By: Leah E. Capritta, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whale Family Investments LP
Represented By: John P. Kern
Represented By: Toby B. Fullmer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ranslem
Represented By: John P. Kern
Represented By: Toby B. Fullmer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny McGuffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rethink Direct Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irish Marketing LLC
Represented By: John P. Kern
Represented By: Rachel C. Agius
Represented By: Thomas D. Leland, PHV
Represented By: Leah E. Capritta, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Smth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Yoshida
Represented By: Daniel Louis Balsam
Represented By: Jacob Newel Harker
Represented By: Daniel L Balsam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?