U.S. EEOC v. Packaging Corp. of America
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Packaging Corporation of America and Schwarz Partners, LP
Case Number: 2:2020cv01948
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kayla K. Cox on behalf of Packaging Corporation of America. Attorney Cox, Kayla K. added. (Cox, Kayla)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Packaging Corporation of America. (Cox, Kayla)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Packaging Corporation of America on 11/9/2020, Answer due 1/8/2021 (Baker, James)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST for WAIVER of SERVICE sent to Schwarz Partners, LP by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Baker, James)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for WAIVER of SERVICE sent to Packaging Corporation of America by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Baker, James)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by James H. Baker, GOVT on behalf of U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Attorney Baker, James H. added. (Baker, James)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Packaging Corporation of America, Schwarz Partners, LP* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Marcia Lynne Mitchell* *U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission* *450 Golden Gate Ave., POB 36025* *San Francisco, CA 94102*. (Benson, A.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Attorney Mitchell, Marcia Lynne added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Marcia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. EEOC v. Packaging Corp. of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Marcia Lynne Mitchell, GOVT
Represented By: James H. Baker, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packaging Corporation of America
Represented By: Kayla K. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarz Partners, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?