Abbie et al v. Shasta County et al
Plaintiff: Aaron James Abbie, Betty Abbie and Amanda Varner
Defendant: Dave Kent, Shasta County, Shasta County Sheriff Department, Van Gerwen, Vorhis, Schritter and Tom Basenko
Case Number: 2:2020cv01995
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint by Aaron James Abbie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carrillo, Michael) Modified on 11/30/2020 (Benson, A.).
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Shasta County served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (Rios, Ralph)
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Tom Basenko served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (Rios, Ralph)
October 23, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Dave Kent served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (Rios, Ralph)
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Van Gerwen served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (Rios, Ralph)
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Vorhis served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (Rios, Ralph)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Shasta County Sheriff Department served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (Rios, Ralph)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Schritter served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (Rios, Ralph)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED. (Rios, Ralph).
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Pine for Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota: This matter is set for an Initial Scheduling Conference on 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota at 2986 Bechelli Lane, Redding, California. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this minute order on defendants not yet appearing.(Pine, C)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller ORDERING this matter REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for pretrial scheduling. Accordingly, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 2/11/2021 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED, and will be reset by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this minute order on Defendants not yet appearing. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Tom Basenko, Dave Kent, Schritter, Shasta County, Shasta County Sheriff Department, Van Gerwen, Vorhis* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael S. Carrillo* *Carrillo Firm, LLP* *1499 Huntington Dr., Suite 402* *South Pasadena, CA 91030*. (Benson, A.)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by All Plaintiffs. Attorney Carrillo, Michael S. added. (Carrillo, Michael)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by BETTY ABBIE (Carrillo, Michael)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by all plaintiffs. Attorney Carrillo, Michael S. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9161390)((Carrillo, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbie et al v. Shasta County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Kent
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta County
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta County Sheriff Department
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Gerwen
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vorhis
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schritter
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Basenko
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron James Abbie
Represented By: Michael S. Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Abbie
Represented By: Michael S. Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Varner
Represented By: Michael S. Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?