Calhoon v. Motel 6 Operating L.P., et al.,
Plaintiff: Wayne S. Calhoon
Defendant: James Hightower and Motel 6 Operating LP Doing business as Motel 6 South Lake Tahoe
Case Number: 2:2020cv02046
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
2 Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/21/2021, RELATING CASE(s) 2:19-CV-2165 KJM JDP and 2:20-CV-2046 KJM AC. REASSIGNING CASE 2:20-CV-2046 to Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Allison Claire no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:20-CV-2046 KJM JDP.(Reader, L)
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:19-cv-02165 by Wayne S. Calhoon. (Bradley, Edwin)
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/23/2021: According to the representations in the most recent filing, ECF No. #7 , this case is related to 2:19-cv-02165 KJM-JDP. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to filed a Notice of Related Cases as required by Local Rule 123. See L.R. 123(b). (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Edwin Bradley re [ 6 ] Minute Order. (Bradley, Edwin)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/7/2021: Defendants have not yet appeared in this action. As of today's date, no further action has been taken by Plaintiff to complete litigation of this case. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file a declaration as to the status of this case within fourteen (14) days. If Plaintiff files a request for default in accordance with the Local Rule 302(c)(19), a declaration need not be filed. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Motel 6 Operating LP served on 11/18/2020. (Bradley, Edwin) Modified on 2/18/2021 (Reader, L).
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *James Hightower, Motel 6 Operating LP* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Edwin L. Bradley, II* *Raff Law, APC* *17 Keller Street* *Petaluma, CA 94952*. (Benson, A.)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Wayne S. Calhoon (Bradley, Edwin)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Wayne S. Calhoon. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9175341) (Bradley, Edwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calhoon v. Motel 6 Operating L.P., et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motel 6 Operating LP Doing business as Motel 6 South Lake Tahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne S. Calhoon
Represented By: Edwin L. Bradley, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?