(HC) Johnson v. Cueva
Petitioner: Byron C. Johnson
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus and Daniel E. Cueva
Case Number: 2:2020cv02060
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Gregory G Hollows
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-2060 JAM GGH (HC). (Plummer, M)
November 13, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 12 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Byron C. Johnson. (Plummer, M)
November 13, 2020 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: 12 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Byron C. Johnson. (Plummer, M)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Boomer, Janine)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (Henshaw, R)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/27/2020. Consent or Decline due by 11/30/2020. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/27/2020 DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
October 27, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Byron C. Johnson. (Henshaw, R)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SACRAMENTO DIVISION OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/15/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 16, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Byron C. Johnson. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 16, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Byron C. Johnson. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Petitioner's Consent or Decline due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Maldonado, C)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Byron Johnson; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/14/2020. (Maldonado, C)
October 14, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order Authorizing IFP Status, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Byron C Johnson. (Maldonado, C)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Byron C Johnson. (Maldonado, C)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against On Habeas Corpus by Byron C Johnson.(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Johnson v. Cueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Byron C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel E. Cueva
Represented By: Janine Winifred Boomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?