Hussein v. Wolf et al
Petitioner: Alia Ahmed Mohsen Hussein
Respondent: Thomas Cioppa, Chad Wolf, Christopher A. Wray and Mike Pompeo
Case Number: 2:2020cv02095
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Clerk's Notice, #13 Civil New Case Documents for JAM served on Reem H. Odeh NCAED. (Jessen, A)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Directing Attorney Reem H. Odeh to Submit Petition for Admission to Practice in the Eastern District of California. (Jessen, A)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-04586.
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of California the electronic record. (rp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/20/2020.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Agreed motion to change venue #7 is granted. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California forthwith. Status hearing date of 10/20/2020 and notice of motion date of 10/23/2020 are stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Emailed notice (cdh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/20/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Craig Arthur Oswald for presentment of motion to change venue #7 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/23/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Oswald, Craig) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/20/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants Thomas Cioppa, Mike Pompeo, Chad Wolf, Christopher A. Wray to change venue Agreed (Oswald, Craig) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/20/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Thomas Cioppa, Mike Pompeo, Chad Wolf, Christopher A. Wray (Treacy, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/20/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Thomas Cioppa, Mike Pompeo, Chad Wolf, Christopher A. Wray (Oswald, Craig) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/20/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 10/20/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for the hearing is as follows: Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Mailed notice (cdh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/20/2020.]
August 25, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Thomas Cioppa, U.S. Attorney (kl, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/20/2020.]
August 18, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Christopher A. Wray, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (jn, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/20/2020.]
August 6, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/20/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT fee paid previously but complaint was not uploaded filed by Alia Ahme Mohsen Hussein. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17285089. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Odeh, Reem) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (ecw, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 10/20/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 EXHIBIT by Alia Ahme Mohsen Hussein (Odeh, Reem) Modified on 8/10/2020 (smm, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice.(smm, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussein v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alia Ahmed Mohsen Hussein
Represented By: Reem H. Odeh, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Cioppa
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Pompeo
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?