(HC) Bonner v. Covello
Petitioner: Thaddeus Keith Bonner
Respondent: P. Covello
Case Number: 2:2020cv02102
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Thaddeus Keith Bonner. (Jessen, A)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:20-cv-06205.
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/20/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 10/21/2020.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Thaddeus Keith Bonner. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2020: #1 Envelope) (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 10/21/2020.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Thaddeus Keith Bonner. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/21/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Thaddeus Keith Bonner. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/21/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION Order to Show Cause or Peremiptory Writ filed by Thaddeus Keith Bonner. Responses due by 9/30/2020. Replies due by 10/14/2020. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/21/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served on 9/2/2020 by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 9/2/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 10/21/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/13/2020. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served on 9/2/2020 by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 9/2/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 10/21/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Thaddeus Keith Bonner. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/21/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byThaddeus Keith Bonner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Bonner v. Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thaddeus Keith Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: P. Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?