(PS) Madariaga et al v. Freedom Mortgage & Trustee Corps
Plaintiff: Seila Madariaga and Christina Madariaga
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage & Trustee Corps
Case Number: 2:2020cv02141
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Unable to Forward: 11 Minute Order sent to Seila Madariaga. Notice of Change of Address due by 2/16/2021. (Becknal, R)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 Amended Proof of Service of Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation's Motion to Dismiss #10 by Freedom Mortgage & Trustee Corps. (Mayer, Danielle) Modified on 11/17/2020 (Kaminski, H).
November 12, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: [ 11 ] Minute Order served on Christina Madariaga, Seila Madariaga. (York, M)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy M. York for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/12/2020 re #10 Motion to Dismiss: The hearing on the motion now scheduled for Wednesday, January 06, 2021, is ORDERED SUBMITTED without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (York, M)
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED #8 MOTION to DISMISS by Freedom Mortgage & Trustee Corps. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mayer, Danielle) Modified on 11/12/2020 (York, M).
November 12, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Minute Order served on Christina Madariaga, and Seila Madariaga. (Krueger, M)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/12/2020: Pursuant to Local Rule 302(c)(21), Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #8 ) shall be noticed before the assigned Magistrate Judge. Counsel for Defendant shall contact the Clerk for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for available law and motion dates, and re-notice the motion before the Magistrate Judge with the proper time and date. Accordingly, the 1/7/2021 hearing before District Judge Troy L. Nunley is VACATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by Freedom Mortgage & Trustee Corps. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2020 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mayer, Danielle)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Christina Madariaga to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Coll, A)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mayer, Danielle)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Freedom Mortgage & Trustee Corps. (Mayer, Danielle) Modified on 10/30/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Zignago, K.)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:19-cv-02432-MCE-DB (PS) by Freedom Mortgage & Trustee Corps. (Mayer, Danielle)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Freedom Mortgage & Trustee Corps. (Mayer, Danielle)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UF-2018-0008180 by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9203753) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danielle M. Mayer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayer, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Madariaga et al v. Freedom Mortgage & Trustee Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seila Madariaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Madariaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage & Trustee Corps
Represented By: Danielle M. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?