(PS) Davidzon v. SF Markets, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vladislav Davidzon
Defendant: SF Markets, LLC and Corey Cockrum
Case Number: 2:2020cv02221
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Corey Cockrum, SF Markets, LLC in re #6 Motion to Dismiss, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, pg. 3, Sprouts policy face coverings, #2 Exhibit 2, pgs 4 to 17, Facebook Photo Compliations)(Roller, Amber)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Corey Cockrum, SF Markets, LLC in SUPPORT of #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, pgs 14 to 16 Medical Opinion)(Roller, Amber) Modified on 11/13/2020 (Kaminski, H).
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Corey Cockrum, SF Markets, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Roller, Amber) Modified on 11/13/2020 (Kaminski, H).
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Corey Cockrum, SF Markets, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil New Case Documents for JAM. (Roller, Amber)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Becknal, R)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Corey Cockrum, SF Markets, LLC. (Roller, Amber)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Corey Cockrum, SF Markets, LLC (Roller, Amber)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Shasta County Superior Court, case number CL-20-0000234 by SF Markets, LLC, Corey Cockrum. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9226224) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roller, Amber)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Davidzon v. SF Markets, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SF Markets, LLC
Represented By: Amber Leigh Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Cockrum
Represented By: Amber Leigh Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladislav Davidzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?