Interlink Products International, Inc. v Crowfoot et al
Plaintiff: Interlink Products International, Inc.
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Drew Bohan, Wade Crowfoot, Lea Haro and Melissa Rae King
Case Number: 2:2020cv02277
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/22/2021 ORDERING the following: 1) This action shall be STAYED until the Ninth Circuit issues its ruling in Association des leveurs de Canards et d'Oies du Qubec v. Bonta, Ninth Circuit case no. 20-55882/20-55944; 2) The parties shall notify the court within 7 days of any resolution in Association des leveurs de Canards et dOies du Qubec v. Bonta; 3) Defendants' responsive pleading to Interlink's First Amended Complaint shall be due 45 days after the issuance of the Ninth Circuit's ruling and 4) The Status Conference currently scheduled on 7/8/2021 is VACATED. (Tupolo, A)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Re: Stay of Consolidated Actions by Drew Bohan, Melissa Rae King. (Covington, Courtney)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/25/21 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall have until May 24, 2021, to file a first amended complaint; defendants shall have 30 days following the filing of a first amended complaint to file a responsive pleading; and all other court-ordered dates shall remain unchanged. (Kaminski, H)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Drew Bohan, Melissa Rae King by Interlink Products International, Inc..(Tenenbaum, Michael)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint by Interlink Products International, Inc.. (Tenenbaum, Michael)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/14/2021 CONSOLIDATING Case No. 2:20-cv-02283-KJM-CKD Interlink Products International, Inc. v. Becerra et al. into the case of Interlink Products International, Inc. v. Bohan, Case No. 2:20-cv-02277. Interlink shall file a First Amended Complaint in the consolidated action by 5/17/2021, Defendants shall file a responsive pleading to the first amended complaint by 6/18/2021. The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is RESET for 7/8/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Consolidation of Cases and Filing of First Amended Complaint by Interlink Products International, Inc.. (Tenenbaum, Michael)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Xavier Becerra, Drew Bohan, Melissa Rae King. Attorney Covington, Courtney Suzanne added. (Covington, Courtney)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel M. Fuchs on behalf of Drew Bohan, Wade Crowfoot, Lea Haro, Melissa Rae King. Attorney Fuchs, Daniel M. added. (Fuchs, Daniel)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Courtney Suzanne Covington on behalf of Drew Bohan, Wade Crowfoot, Lea Haro, Melissa Rae King. Attorney Covington, Courtney Suzanne added. (Covington, Courtney)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/1/2021: Plaintiff's Proposed Substitution of Attorney, ECF No. #41 , is ADOPTED. Accordingly, Attorney Michael Tenenbaum, Esq. is SUBSTITUTED as counsel of record for Plaintiff Interlink Products International, Inc. in place of Attorneys Jason B. Lattimore and Daniel L. Schmutter. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Interlink Products International, Inc.. (Tenenbaum, Michael)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/11/2021 ORDERING counsel for plaintiff Interlink Products International, Inc. must submit within 14 days a petition for admission to the bar of this court or an application to appear pro hac vice. (Tupolo, A)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #40 Order served on Jason B. Lattimore NCAED, Daniel L. Schmutter NCAED. (Tupolo, A)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The proposed Substitutions of Attorney, ECF Nos. #33 and #34 , are GRANTED. Accordingly, Attorney Russell Hildreth, is SUBSTITUTED as counsel of record for Defendants Melissa Rae King and Drew Bohan, in place of Attorneys Mark D. Marino and Stephen Wellinghorst. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: Minute Order filed at ECF N. 39 served on Jason B. Lattimore, Mark D. Marino, Daniel L. Schmutter, and Stephen Wellinghorst. (Schultz, C)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: As of 11/16/2020, counsel have not complied with Clerk's Notice, ECF No. #31 . The court now directs all counsel to submit Pro Hac Vice Applications to comply with ECF No. #31 by Monday, 12/21/2020. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In the interest of judicial economy and on the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 3/25/2021 is RESET for 4/22/2021 at 2:30 PM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: Minute Order filed at ECF No. 38 served on Jason B. Lattimore, Mark D. Marino, Daniel L. Schmutter, and Stephen Wellinghorst. (Schultz, C)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: Minute Order filed at ECF No. 37 served on Jason B. Lattimore, Mark D. Marino, Daniel L. Schmutter, and Stephen Wellinghorst. (Schultz, C)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/9/2020. Case related to 2:20-cv-02283-KJM-CKD. (Tupolo, A)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #36 Order served on Jason B. Lattimore PHV, Mark D. Marino PHV, Daniel L. Schmutter PHV, Stephen Wellinghorst PHV. (Tupolo, A)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:20-cv-02283-wbs by Xavier Becerra, et al., . Attorney Hildreth, Russell B. added. (Hildreth, Russell) Modified on 11/30/2020 (Benson, A.).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Drew Bohan. (Hildreth, Russell)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Melissa Rae King. (Hildreth, Russell)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE Directing All Attorneys to Submit Pro Hac Vice Application. (Jessen, A)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:20-cv-07654.
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that Defendants' request to transfer venue is GRANTED; Case transferred to Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/16/2020. (ams, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/16/2020. (ams, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #32 Civil New Case Documents for KJM, #31 Clerk's Notice served on Jason B. Lattimore PHV, Mark D. Marino PHV, Daniel L. Schmutter PHV, Stephen Wellinghorst PHV. (Jessen, A)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated per #29 Order. (ams, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on September 16, 2020, before Judge Kevin McNulty. Court Reporter: Rhea Villanti (732-895-3403). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 11/30/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2021. (wh) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 9/29/2020. (ECR) (jqb, ) Modified on 9/30/2020 (jqb, ). [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER: As discussed on the record during the September 29, 2020 initial scheduling conference, it appearing that Defendant has challenged this Court's jurisdiction over it, and that the parties argued the matter before District Judge McNulty on September 16, 2020, discovery is stayed pending adjudication of the motion. Within seven (7) days of any ruling on the motion, the parties shall inform the Court of the ruling. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/29/2020. (Hammer, Michael) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Joint Discovery Plan by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC..(LATTIMORE, JASON) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' request to adjourn the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is denied. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/25/2020. (TAD) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore re #22 Letter. (LATTIMORE, JASON) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Letter from Mark D. Marino, Esq.. (MARINO, MARK) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE re #19 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Declaration of Eli Zhadanov, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G)(LATTIMORE, JASON) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore re #19 Declaration. (LATTIMORE, JASON) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECLARATION of Supplemental Declaration of Melissa Rae King in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by XAVIER BECERRA, DREW BOHAN, MELISSA RAE KING. (WELLINGHORST, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kevin McNulty: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction Motion & Motion to Dismiss held via video/telephone conference on 9/16/2020. Decision Reserved. (Court Reporter/Recorder Rhea C. Villanti.) (nic, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE re #14 Brief. (MARINO, MARK) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 9/27/2020. To join the scheduling conference call on 9/24/2020, dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/11/2020. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kevin McNulty: Video/Telephone Conference held on 9/11/2020. The controlling complaint is located in member case 20cv10566. (Court Reporter/Recorder Rhea C. Villanti.) (nic, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason B. Lattimore, #2 Exhibit 1 (Lattimore Declaration), #3 Exhibit 2 (Lattimore Declaration), #4 Declaration of Eli Zhadanov)(LATTIMORE, JASON) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER Preserving Defendants' Jurisdictional Arguments; The matter of Interlink v. Becerra et al., Case No. 2:20-cv-10566 is consolidated into this action for all purposes, etc.; Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Wade Crowfoot and Lea Haro are dismissed without Prejudice; Defendants' #8 Motion to Dismiss is administratively terminated without prejudice, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/8/2020. (ams, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION & Consent Order Preserving Defendants' Jurisdictional Arguments by DREW BOHAN, WADE CROWFOOT, MELISSA RAE KING. (WELLINGHORST, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . (LATTIMORE, JASON) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Stephen Wellinhorst: $ 150, receipt number TRE113467 (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Russell B. Hildreth, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/3/2020. (ams, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Certification on behalf of DREW BOHAN, WADE CROWFOOT, MELISSA RAE KING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WELLINGHORST, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by DREW BOHAN, WADE CROWFOOT, MELISSA RAE KING. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WELLINGHORST, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN WELLINGHORST on behalf of DREW BOHAN, WADE CROWFOOT, MELISSA RAE KING (WELLINGHORST, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. DREW BOHAN served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; WADE CROWFOOT served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; MELISSA RAE KING served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service on Wade Crowfoot, #2 Declaration of Service on Drew Bohan, #3 Declaration of Service on Melissa Rae King)(LATTIMORE, JASON) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. DREW BOHAN served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020; WADE CROWFOOT served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020; MELISSA RAE KING served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (LATTIMORE, JASON) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2020 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 9/25/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/2/2020. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DREW BOHAN, WADE CROWFOOT, LEA HARO, MELISSA RAE KING. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (LATTIMORE, JASON) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10978922), filed by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LATTIMORE, JASON) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interlink Products International, Inc. v Crowfoot et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Mark D. Marino, PHV
Represented By: Russell B. Hildreth
Represented By: Mark D. Marino, NCAED
Represented By: Courtney Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Bohan
Represented By: Stephen Wellinghorst, PHV
Represented By: Mark D. Marino, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Wellinghorst, NCAED
Represented By: Russell B. Hildreth
Represented By: Mark D. Marino, NCAED
Represented By: Courtney Covington
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Crowfoot
Represented By: Stephen Wellinghorst, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Wellinghorst, NCAED
Represented By: Russell B. Hildreth
Represented By: Courtney Covington
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lea Haro
Represented By: Courtney Covington
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Rae King
Represented By: Stephen Wellinghorst, PHV
Represented By: Mark D. Marino, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Wellinghorst, NCAED
Represented By: Russell B. Hildreth
Represented By: Mark D. Marino, NCAED
Represented By: Courtney Covington
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interlink Products International, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L. Schmutter, PHV
Represented By: Jason B. Lattimore, PHV
Represented By: Daniel L. Schmutter, NCAED
Represented By: Jason B. Lattimore, NCAED
Represented By: Michael Allen Tenenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?