(PC) Hill v. Danforth
Plaintiff: William C. Hill
Defendant: Paul Danforth
Case Number: 2:2020cv02278
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/23/2020 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of William C. Hill. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/23/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Henshaw, R)
November 23, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Directing Prisoner Payment and #4 Order served on William C. Hill. #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and #5 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Rio Cosumnes Correctional Center, Attention Inmate Trust Accounts, 12500 Bruceville Rd., Elk Gove, California 95757. (Henshaw, R)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Zignago, K.)
November 17, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on William C. Hill. (Zignago, K.)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by William C. Hill. (Zignago, K.)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Paul Danforth by William C. Hill. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Hill v. Danforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Danforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?