Interlink Products International, Inc. v. Becerra et al
Plaintiff: Interlink Products International, Inc.
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, MELISSA RAE KING and Drew Bohan
Case Number: 2:2020cv02283
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
2 Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
3 Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: As of 11/16/2020, counsel have not complied with Clerk's Notice, ECF No. #25 . The court now directs all counsel to submit Pro Hac Vice Applications to comply with ECF No. #25 by Monday, 12/21/2020. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
December 15, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: Minute Order filed at ECF No. 39 served on Jason B. Lattimore and Daniel L. Schmutter. (Schultz, C)
December 10, 2020 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION re #36 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. Reissued. See docket #37 Civil New Case Documents. (Tupolo, A)
December 10, 2020 Filing 37 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS REISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
December 10, 2020 Filing 36 [DISREGARD. See ECF. #37 ]CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 02:30 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
December 10, 2020 Filing 35 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/9/2020 ORDERING that Case No. 2:20-cv-02283-WBS-DB is REASSIGNED from Judge William B. Shubb to the undersigned and from Magistrate Judge Debra Barnes to Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as: Case No. 2:20-cv- 02283-KJM-CKD. (Tupolo, A)
December 10, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #35 Order Reassigning Case, #37 Civil New Case Documents for KJM served on Jason B. Lattimore PHV, Daniel L. Schmutter PHV. (Tupolo, A)
November 25, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:20-cv-02277-kjm by Xavier Becerra, Drew Bohan, Melissa Rae King. (Hildreth, Russell)
November 25, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:20-cv-02277-kjm by Xavier Becerra, Drew Bohan, Melissa Rae King. (Hildreth, Russell)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/23/2020: Russell B. Hildreth for MELISSA RAE KING in place of attorney Mark D. Marino, PHV. (Coll, A)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/23/2020: Russell B. Hildreth for Drew Bohan in place of attorney Mark D. Marino, PHV. (Coll, A)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/23/2020: Russell B. Hildreth for Xavier Becerra in place of attorney Mark D. Marino, PHV. (Coll, A)
November 24, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #30 #31 #32 Substitution of Attorney Orders served on Jason B. Lattimore PHV, Daniel L. Schmutter PHV. (Coll, A)
November 20, 2020 Filing 29 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Xavier Becerra. (Hildreth, Russell)
November 20, 2020 Filing 28 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Drew Bohan. (Hildreth, Russell)
November 20, 2020 Filing 27 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by MELISSA RAE KING. (Hildreth, Russell)
November 16, 2020 Filing 26 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/1/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
November 16, 2020 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE Directing All Attorneys to Submit Pro Hac Vice Application. (Rivera, O)
November 16, 2020 Filing 24 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:20-cv-10566.
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that Defendants' request to transfer venue is GRANTED; Case transferred to the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/16/2020. (ams, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 22 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/16/2020. (ams, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Case extracted via ECF to Eastern District of California. (mfr) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
November 16, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #25 Clerk's Notice, #26 Civil New Case Documents for WBS served on Jason B. Lattimore PHV, Mark D. Marino PHV, Daniel L. Schmutter PHV. (Rivera, O)
September 16, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Russel B. Hildreth: $ 150, receipt number TRE114027 (mg) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER Preserving Defendants' Jurisdictional Arguments; The matter of Interlink v. Becerra et al., Case No. 2:20-cv-10566 is consolidated into Case No. 2:20-cv-7654 for all purposes, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/8/2020. (ams, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CONSENT ORDER preserving Defendants' Jurisdictional Arguments re #17 Stipulation. etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/8/2020. (dam, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK D. MARINO on behalf of Defendants XAVIER BECERRA, DREW BOHAN, and MELISSA RAE KING (MARINO, MARK) Modified on 9/8/2020 (dam). [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated per #21 Order. (ams, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa Rae King in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, #2 Certification of Counsel in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction)(MARINO, MARK) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER PRESERVING DEFENDANTS JURISDICTIONAL ARGUMENTS by All Defendants. (WELLINGHORST, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: In view of Mr. Lattimore's August 28, 2020 letter [D.E. 13], the parties are not required to file a discovery confidentiality order at this time.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/2/2020. (Hammer, Michael) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of RUSSELL B. HILDRETH, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/1/2020. (dam, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 Certification of Stephen Wellinghorst, Esq. in Support of Application of Admission of Russell B. Hildreth, Esq. Pro Hac Vice on behalf of XAVIER BECERRA, DREW BOHAN, MELISSA RAE KING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Admitting Russell B. Hildreth, Esq. Pro Hac Vice)(MARINO, MARK) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore re #10 Scheduling Order. (LATTIMORE, JASON) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by XAVIER BECERRA, DREW BOHAN, MELISSA RAE KING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #3 Certification Certification in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint)(MARINO, MARK) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK D. MARINO on behalf of XAVIER BECERRA, DREW BOHAN, MELISSA RAE KING (MARINO, MARK) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #12 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/26/2020. (ECR) (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that on or before 9/4/2020, Plaintiff shall produce to Defendants all communications between Plaintiff and Home Depot and/or Amazon. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/26/2020. (dam, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: There will be a telephone conference with the Undersigned today, August 26, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. to discuss expedited discovery in this matter. Counsel shall dial 1-888-684-8852 and dial 1456817# to join the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/26/2020. (MAH) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendants shall submit papers in response to Interlinks Motion on or before September 4, 2020; no reply is authorized; counsel for the parties shall contact Hon. Michael A. Hammer, United States Magistrate Judge, by August 26, 2020, for the purpose of a telephone conference to discuss any expedited discovery that may be required; a telephone conference is scheduled on September 11, 2020, at 2:00 pm to discuss administrative and logistic issues in connection with the hearing; the hearing on Interlinks Motion is scheduled on September 16, 2020, at 11:00 am via video conference. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/21/2020. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Certification of Service on behalf of INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Re #6 Certification in Support of Motion, #4 Motion for TRO, #5 Certification in Support of Motion. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction DECLARATION OF JASON B. LATTIMORE (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction DECLARATION OF ELI ZHADANOV (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to XAVIER BECERRA, DREW BOHAN, MELISSA RAE KING. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (LATTIMORE, JASON) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11212158), filed by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(LATTIMORE, JASON) [Transferred from njd on 11/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interlink Products International, Inc. v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Mark D. Marino, PHV
Represented By: Russell B. Hildreth
Represented By: Mark D. Marino, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA RAE KING
Represented By: Mark D. Marino, PHV
Represented By: Russell B. Hildreth
Represented By: Mark D. Marino, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Bohan
Represented By: Mark D. Marino, PHV
Represented By: Russell B. Hildreth
Represented By: Mark D. Marino, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interlink Products International, Inc.
Represented By: Jason B. Lattimore, PHV
Represented By: Daniel L. Schmutter, PHV
Represented By: Daniel L. Schmutter, NCAED
Represented By: Jason B. Lattimore, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?