Narvaez v. WebMD LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mary Narvaez
Defendant: Mouseflow, Inc. and WebMD LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02305
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Zoe K. Wilhelm on behalf of WebMD LLC. Attorney Wilhelm, Zoe K. added. (Wilhelm, Zoe)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/21/2020 ORDERING Mouseflow, Inc. to file response to complaint on or before 2/4/2021. (Zignago, K.)
December 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Julianna Simon on behalf of Mouseflow, Inc.. Attorney Simon, Julianna added. (Simon, Julianna)
December 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Harrison Maxwell Brown on behalf of Mouseflow, Inc.. Attorney Brown, Harrison Maxwell added. (Brown, Harrison)
December 18, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to respond re #1 Complaint by Mouseflow, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tagvoryan, Ana) Modified on 12/21/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Ana)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ana Tagvoryan on behalf of Mouseflow, Inc.. Attorney Tagvoryan, Ana added. (Tagvoryan, Ana)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/17/20 ORDERING that WebMD LLC shall file its response to the Complaint in this action on or before February 4, 2021. (Kaminski, H)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant WebMD LLC. (Jaeger, Michael)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend WebMD LLC's Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by WebMD LLC. Attorney Jaeger, Michael added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaeger, Michael) Modified on 12/23/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Mouseflow, Inc., WebMD LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joel Dashiell Smith* *Bursor & Fisher, P.A.* *1990 North California Blvd., Suite 940* *Walnut Creek, CA 94596*. (Benson, A.)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mouseflow, Inc., WebMD LLC by Mary Narvaez. Attorney Smith, Joel Dashiell added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9253660) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Narvaez v. WebMD LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mouseflow, Inc.
Represented By: Ana Tagvoryan
Represented By: Harrison Maxwell Brown
Represented By: Julianna Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebMD LLC
Represented By: Zoe K. Wilhelm
Represented By: Michael Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Narvaez
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?