(HC) Meza v. Pfeiffer
Petitioner: Ronald Meza
Respondent: Christian Pfeiffer
Case Number: 2:2020cv02316
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/06/21. Consent or Decline due by 2/8/2021 (Plummer, M)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Petition for writ of habeas corpus #1 served on Tami Krenzin, Attorney General. (Plummer, M)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/06/21 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Also, DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General.(cc: Tami Krenzin, Attorney General) (Plummer, M)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition,, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Ronald Meza. (Plummer, M)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SACRAMENTO DIVISION OF THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/18/2020(Martin-Gill, S)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ronald Meza. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ronald Meza. (Maldonado, C)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Christian Pfeiffer by Ronald Meza.(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Meza v. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christian Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Meza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?