Canterberry v. Acara Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tommy Canterberry
Defendant: Siemens Mobility, Inc. and Acara Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02361
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gregory G. Iskander on behalf of Siemens Mobility, Inc. Attorney Iskander, Gregory G. added. (Iskander, Gregory)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Siemens Mobility, Inc. re #2 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Garcia Perez, Yesenia)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Siemens Mobility, Inc. re #2 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Garcia Perez, Yesenia)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of JOINDER and CONSENT to REMOVAL by Acara Solutions, Inc. Attorney Barber, John L. added. (Barber, John) Modified on 12/1/2020 (Huang, H).
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2020-002-86414 by Siemens Mobility, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9267117) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Yesenia Garcia Perez, #3 Exhibit A-D ISO DEC of Yesenia Garcia Perez, #4 Declaration of Christine Laster, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Certificate of Service)(Garcia Perez, Yesenia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canterberry v. Acara Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Yesenia Garcia Perez
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acara Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: John L. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Canterberry
Represented By: Ronald Leonardo Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?