(PC) Rodriguez v. Enlers et al
Plaintiff: Julian Rodriguez
Defendant: E. Corter, R. Eulers and R. Enlers
Case Number: 2:2020cv02399
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/28/21 TERMINATING #14 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of the Court shall update the case caption to reflect that defendant Enlers is the sole defendant. Plaintiffs amended complaint #13 is DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days from the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order on Motion to Dismiss, served on Julian Rodriguez. (Plummer, M)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to DISMISS Defendant E. Corter by Julian Rodriguez. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against R. Enlers by Julian Rodriguez.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP served on the Director of CDCR pursuant to #11 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Julian Rodriguez signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/16/2020. The appropriate agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/16/2020 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 motion to proceed ifp; DENYING plaintiff's #4 request for a Spanish-speaking attorney and/or interpreter; and DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with the concurrent order. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action for the reasons stated herein. (Yin, K)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: (ECF No. 9) Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Julian Rodriguez. (Yin, K)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend, #11 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Julian Rodriguez. (Yin, K)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-2399-JAM-EFB (PC). (Coll, A)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST to CORRECT defendant's name by Julian Rodriguez. (Coll, A)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Julian Rodriguez (Reader, L)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Julian Rodriguez, CDC AE-6663 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/3/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 1/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Tupolo, A)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Julian Rodriguez. (Tupolo, A)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Julian Rodriguez. (Tupolo, A)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Julian Rodriguez. (Tupolo, A)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Julian Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Rodriguez v. Enlers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Corter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Eulers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Enlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?