Mitchell v. Bikoba et al
Plaintiff: Krista Mitchell
Defendant: Veronique N. Bikoba, Thomas F. Rutaganira, Keith M. Banks and Pakpour Banks LLP
Case Number: 2:2020cv02410
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT dated *12/8/2020* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/8/2020. (Becknal, R)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/8/2020 DENYING Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for a TRO (ECF No. #1 ) ;DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #2 ); DENYING Plaintiff's Motions to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ECF Nos. #3 , #5 ) as moot; andDIRECTING the Clerk to close this case. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT by Krista Mitchell in support of #1 Motion for TRO. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Krause, Ernest) Modified on 12/8/2020 (Coll, A).
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT LIST by Krista Mitchell re #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Krause, Ernest) Modified on 12/8/2020 (Coll, A).
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Krista Mitchell. (Krause, Ernest)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Krista Mitchell. (Krause, Ernest)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Krista Mitchell. (Krause, Ernest)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Keith M. Banks, Veronique Bikoba, Pakpour Banks LLP, Thomas F. Rutaganira by Krista Mitchell. (Krause, Ernest)
December 4, 2020 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Donati, J)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER against All Defendants by Krista Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 TRO Checklist, #3 Memorandum, #4 Declaration of Irreparable Harm, #5 Notice to Adverse Party, #6 Exhibit 1 - Agency Order 55292, #7 Exhibit 2 - UD Complaint, #8 Exhibit 3 - Covid-19 Diagnosis, #9 Exhibit 4 - New York Times article, #10 Proposed Order, #11 Certificate of Service)(Krause, Ernest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Bikoba et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronique N. Bikoba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F. Rutaganira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith M. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pakpour Banks LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Mitchell
Represented By: Ernest Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?