(PS) Hansen et al v. Arkley et al
Plaintiff: Paul John Hansen and T J Herbst Trust 1
Defendant: Andy Cecere, US Bank Trust National Association, SN Servicing Corporation and Robin P. Arkley
Case Number: 2:2020cv02436
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CORRECTED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. [Re-Issued to correct the Initial Scheduling Conference date] (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Coll, A)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/26/2021 WITHDRAWING #3 Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff is advised to review the Order Setting Status Conference issued on 12/29/2020 and comply with the directives set forth therein (ECF No. 6). (Tupolo, A)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order served on Paul John Hansen, T J Herbst Trust 1. (Tupolo, A)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Civil New Case Documents for KJM served on Paul John Hansen, T J Herbst Trust 1. (Coll, A)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 [DISREGARD, DUPLICATE. SEE ECF #7 ] OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs Paul John Hansen, T J Herbst Trust 1 to #3 Findings and Recommendations. (Tupolo, A)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs Paul John Hansen, T J Herbst Trust 1 to #3 Findings and Recommendations. (Tupolo, A)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Coll, A)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Robin P. Arkley, Andy Cecere, SN Servicing Corporation, US Bank Trust National Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Paul John Hansen* *PO Box 314* *Repton, AL 36475*. (Coll, A)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Summons, #6 Civil New Case Documents for KJM served on Paul John Hansen, T J Herbst Trust 1. (Coll, A)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of PAYMENT of $402 Filing Fee by Paul John Hansen, T J Herbst Trust 1. (Coll, A)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE200111050 $402.00 fbo Paul Hansen by Paul Hansen on 12/29/2020. (Coll, A)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 [WITHDRAWN, pursuant to #9 Order] FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/28/2020 RECOMMENDING the #2 Motion to Proceed IFP be granted, the #1 Complaint be dismissed, and The Clerk be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Tupolo, A) Modified on 1/26/2021 (Tupolo, A).
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Findings and Recommendations served on Paul John Hansen, T J Herbst Trust 1. (Tupolo, A)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Huang, H)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Paul John Hansen. (Huang, H)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robin P. Arkley, Andy Cecere, SN Servicing Corporation, US Bank Trust National Association by Paul John Hansen, T J Herbst Trust 1. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Hansen et al v. Arkley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Cecere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank Trust National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SN Servicing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin P. Arkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T J Herbst Trust 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?