(PS) Huang v. Sapia Networks, Inc.
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Defendant: Sapia Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02465
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 33 Amended Minute Order served on Xiaohua Huang. (Waldrop, A)
December 22, 2020 Filing 33 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/22/2020: Pursuant to the plaintiff's notice for voluntary dismissal (ECF No. #31 ) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this action is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety with each party to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Accordingly, all previously set deadlines and hearings are VACATED. Case CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
December 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 32 Minute Order served on Xiaohua Huang. (Waldrop, A)
December 21, 2020 Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/21/2020: Pursuant to the plaintiff's notice for voluntary dismissal (ECF No. #31 ) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this action is DISMISSED without prejudice in its entirety with each party to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Accordingly, all previously set deadlines and hearings are VACATED. Case CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Waldrop, A)
December 18, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Xiaohua Huang. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 15, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Sapia Networks, Inc. re #29 Notice of Related Case(s). (Peters, Marc)
December 15, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:20-cv-01706-JAM by Sapia Networks, Inc.. (Peters, Marc)
December 14, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #28 Amended Patent New Case Documents, and 27 Notice re: Reassigning Case served on Xiaohua Huang. (Donati, J)
December 14, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED PATENT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Patent #1:* 6999331 * * 2/14/2006 * * Xiaohua Huang * ; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Patent Report) (Donati, J)
December 14, 2020 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to the 26 Minute Order Reassigning Case, this action is Randomly REASSIGNED to District Judge William B. Shubb for all further proceedings. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. is no longer associated with this case. The case number on all future filed documents shall be: 2:20-cv-2465 WBS KJN (PS). (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Donati, J)
December 14, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 26 Minute Order, served on Xiaohua Huang. (Deutsch, S)
December 14, 2020 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to the senior status of District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., the Clerk's Office is directed to reassign this case to another district judge for all further proceedings. (Deutsch, S)
December 14, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #25 Patent New Case Documents for MCE served on Xiaohua Huang. (Lundstrom, T)
December 14, 2020 Filing 25 PATENT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Patent #1:* 6999331 * * 2/14/2006 * * Xiaohua Huang * ; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Patent Report) (Lundstrom, T)
December 14, 2020 Filing 24 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-09928.
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO PROPER VENUE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court ORDERS this case TRANSFERRED to the proper venue: the Eastern District of California. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) See order for further details. (shb) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (Dkt. No. #9 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion(s) and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion(s), noticed for hearing on December 14, 2020, has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Sapia Networks Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Xiaohua Huang(shb) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #9 filed by Plaintiff Xiaohua Huang. (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Sapia Networks Inc., re Notice of Appearance #15 served on 11/23/2020. (Peters, Marc) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL David Paul Enzminger counsel given that Sapia Networks, Inc. will continue to be represented by counsel at Turner Boyd LLP who has already entered an appearance as counsel of record and that the withdrawal of counsel from Winston & Strawn LLP will not prejudice or delay any party to this litigation #16 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
November 24, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Sapia Networks Inc., re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #16 served on 11/24/2020. (Enzminger, David) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
November 24, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Paul Enzminger counsel for Defendant Sapia Networks Inc.. David P. Enzminger is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Sapia Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Enzminger, David) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Marc David Peters on behalf of Defendant Sapia Networks Inc. (Attorney Marc David Peters added to party Sapia Networks Inc.(pty:dft))(Peters, Marc) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Sapia Networks Inc., re Corporate Disclosure Statement #13 served on 11/19/2020. (Enzminger, David) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
November 19, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Sapia Networks Inc. (Enzminger, David) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is accepted as filed.Defendant (Sapia) must file its notice of interested parties by November 23, 2020. (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Sapia Networks, Inc's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Sapia Networks Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 served on 11/18/2020. (Enzminger, David) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant: Sapia Networks, Inc. Sapia Networks Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/14/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David E. Enzminger and Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order) (Enzminger, David) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Paul Enzminger on behalf of Defendant Sapia Networks Inc. (Attorney David Paul Enzminger added to party Sapia Networks Inc.(pty:dft))(Enzminger, David) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI (SEE DOCUMENT FOR COMPLIANCE REQUIREMENTS AND SERVICE OF THIS ORDER ON ALL PARTIES BY PLAINTIFF OR DEFENDANT IF CASE CAME TO THE COURT AS A PETITION FOR REMOVAL) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Case transferred from Judge Virginia A. Phillips to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:20-cv-09928 MCS(AGRx). (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Sapia Networks Inc. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Sapia Networks Inc..Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg,(Filing fee $ 400 paid), Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Xiaohua Huang. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 12/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Huang v. Sapia Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sapia Networks, Inc.
Represented By: David Paul Enzminger
Represented By: Karen I. Boyd
Represented By: Marc David Peters
Represented By: David P. Enzminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?