Enborg et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terri Enborg and Christopher Enborg
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02477
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Forward Time Exp: #75 Substitution of Attorney Order, sent to Christopher Enborg. Notice of Change of Address due by 3/29/2021. (Coll, A)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/13/2021 SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEYS: Mollie F. Benedict, Joshua James Wes, and Nicholas V. Janizeh for Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson in place of attorneys Christy D. Jones, NCAED; Susan M. Robinson, NCAED; Matthew P. Smith, NCAED; Kari L. Sutherland, NCAED; David B. Thomas, NCAED; Pamela Lawrence Ferrell, NCAED and William M. Gage, NCAED. (Huang, H)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #75 Substitution of Attorney Order, served on Christopher Enborg. (Huang, H)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 [DISREGARD - Duplicate Filing] NOTICE of RELATED CASES: 1:20-cv-00958-AWI, 1:20-cv-00044-AWI, 2:20-cv-02477-TLN, 2:19-cv-02237-AWI, 1:20-cv-00818-AWI, 1:20-cv-00357-AWI, 2:20-cv-00354-AWI, 2:20-cv-01744-TLN, 2:20-cv-00787-AWI, 1:20-cv-00130-AWI, 1:20-cv-00129-AWI, 1:20-cv-1512-AWI by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Benedict, Mollie) Modified on 1/14/2021 (Huang, H).
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of RELATED CASES: 1:20-cv-00958-AWI, 1:20-cv-00044-AWI, 2:20-cv-02477-TLN, 2:19-cv-02237-AWI, 1:20-cv-00818-AWI, 1:20-cv-00357-AWI, 2:20-cv-00354-AWI, 2:20-cv-01744-TLN, 2:20-cv-00787-AWI, 1:20-cv-00130-AWI, 1:20-cv-00129-AWI, 1:20-cv-1512-AWI by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Attorney Benedict, Mollie Fleming added. (Benedict, Mollie) Modified on 1/14/2021 (Huang, H).
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benedict, Mollie)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to PO Box 51, Meridian, ID 83680 by Christopher Enborg. (Coll, A)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Unable to Forward: 70 Minute Order sent to Christopher Enborg. Notice of Change of Address due by 3/1/2021. (Tupolo, A)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/15/2020: A review of the case shows that this matter was transferred from another district court. As is the practice of this Court, any dates pending prior to transfer are hereby VACATED. The parties are ORDERED to re-notice any pending motions before Judge Troy L. Nunley on an appropriate law and motion date and submit on the briefs. The parties may also file and notice new motions if they wish to raise new issues. (Text Only Entry) (Krueger, M)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE Directing All Attorneys to Submit Pro Hac Vice Application. (Jessen, A)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-18734.
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 70 Minute Order served on Christopher Enborg. (Krueger, M)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #69 Civil New Case Documents for TLN served on Christopher Enborg. (Jessen, A)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2649) - Mem Opinion and Order Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot of Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8755) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot of Timothy Ulatowski, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8822) Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 12/14/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (7349) Pls Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (7462) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8751) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8878) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford)(Gage, William) (Modified on 12/14/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3614) Pls Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3616) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3750) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3849) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6300) Memo Opinion and Order re Olga Ramm, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8736) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8815) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm)(Gage, William) (Modified on 12/14/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2724) - Memo Opinion and Order re Steven MacLean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8731) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8832) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean)(Gage, William) (Modified on 12/14/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2076) Pls Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2098) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2140) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2253) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2643) Memo Opinion and Order re Teri A. Longacre, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8729) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8891) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre)(Gage, William) Modified on 12/14/2020 (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (8565) Pls Mot to Exclude Bruce Kahn, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (8566) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Kahn, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8643) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Bruce Kahn, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8660) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Kahn, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8723) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Bruce Kahn, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8900) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Bruce Kahn)(Gage, William) (Modified on 12/14/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (5333) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8776) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8858) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 12/14/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2668) - Mem Opinion and Order Regarding Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 12/14/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Def's Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2664) - Mem Opinion and Order regarding Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Def's Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8807) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8855) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Gage, William) (Modified on 12/14/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (8804) Part 1 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 2 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 3 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 4 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 5 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 6 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 7 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 8 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 9 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 10 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8805) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (8829) Exhs in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8865) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 12/14/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Valimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2251) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (2710) Mem Opinion and Order re Vladimir Iakovlev, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #27 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 12/14/2020 to add party filers)(mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1977) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1981) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2100) - Defs' Mot to Substitute Amended Exhibit A to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2164) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2210) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2698) - Mem Opinion and Order of Mot Regarding Scott Guelcher, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 4 - Def's Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (4574) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (4692) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8790) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8839) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher)(Gage, William) (Modified on 12/14/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (240) Master Answer of Ethicon LLC to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 12/14/2020 to add party filers)(mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TRANSFER ORDER directing that on 12/15/2020 this case shall be transferred to the United States District Court of Eastern California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 12/14/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract and transfer this case to the United States District Court of Eastern California; if this case is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/1/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER The #43 MOTION by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg to Strike Defendants' Non-Retained Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337 is GRANTED in part to the extent plaintiffs seek an order striking the experts identified by defendants in excess of five each and is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/30/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #28 MOTION by Steven D. Davis and Maxwell S. Kennerly of TorHoerman Law LLC to Withdraw as Attorney of Record on behalf of Christopher Enborg only; the Clerk is directed to remove the above counsel for Mr. Enborg and note that he is now pro se. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/30/2020. (cc: counsel of record; Mr. Endborg) (kew) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #47 Memorandum In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #45 Brief In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #46 Opposition by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #43 Motion by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg to Strike Defendants' Non-Retained Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337. ERROR: Incorrect Exhibits C and D attached. CORRECTION: Exhibits C and D replaced. (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg in opposition to #42 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Donald R. Ostergard, M.D. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(Davis, Steven) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #43 MOTION by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg to Strike Defendants' Non-Retained Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gage, William) (Modified on 11/20/2019 to replace exhibits C and D) (ts). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 OPPOSITION by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg in opposition to #40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Davis, Steven) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg in support of #43 MOTION by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg to Strike Defendants' Non-Retained Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337 (Davis, Steven) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg to Strike Defendants' Non-Retained Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Davis, Steven) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Strike Late Supplemental Report and MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Donald R. Ostergard, M.D. and Supporting Memorandum of Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gage, William). (Modified on 11/4/2019 to add event motion to strike) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in Support of #40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Family and Friends on TBD at TBD (Lawrence, Pamela) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #35 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg of Olga Ramm, MD on October 22, 2019 at 3:00pm (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg for Amended Case-Specific Expert Report. (Davis, Steven) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg of Olga Ramm, MD on October 22, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. Pacific (Davis, Steven) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg of Olga Ramm,,MD on October 22, 2019 at 3:00pm (PDT) (Davis, Steven) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 JOINT MOTION by Ethicon, LLC, Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Terri Enborg, Christopher Enborg of Dismissal of Ethicon, LLC, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Defendant Ethicon, LLC only is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/7/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JOINT MOTION by Ethicon, LLC, Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Terri Enborg, Christopher Enborg of Dismissal of Ethicon, LLC. (Lawrence, Pamela) (Modified on 10/4/2019 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Larry Bowen, MD on 10.08.2019 at 4:00 pm PDT (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition to Larry Bowen, MD)(Smith, Matthew) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Larry Bowen, MD on 10.08.2019 at 4:00 pm PDT (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition to Larry Bowen, MD)(Smith, Matthew) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Donald Ostergard on 10/18/2019 at 1:00 p.m. MDT (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION by Steven D. Davis and Maxwell S. Kennerly of TorHoerman Law LLC to Withdraw as Attorney of Record on behalf of Christopher Enborg only (Davis, Steven) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Terri Enborg on 8/21/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Lawrence, Pamela) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg for Plaintiff's Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Davis, Steven) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Christopher Enborg on 9/5/2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Lawrence, Pamela) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Pamela Lawrence on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Lawrence, Pamela) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Notice of Appearance by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson re: #18 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Pamela Lawrence on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Lawrence, Pamela) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Andrew John Walter, MD on 09/13/2019 at 2:00 pm PDT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition)(Smith, Matthew) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Christopher Enborg on 8/21/2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Lawrence, Pamela) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Terri Enborg on 8/21/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Lawrence, Pamela) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff and First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Christopher Enborg. (Lawrence, Pamela) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Pamela Lawrence on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Lawrence, Pamela) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Matthew P. Smith on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Smith, Matthew) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg. (Davis, Steven) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER # 337 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 12 Cases) The court ORDERS that the cases on Exhibit A are: (1) removed from the pending inactive docket; and (2) placed on the active docket. The court further ORDERS that: (1) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; (2) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibit A, the deadlines below also apply to them; (3) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and every case listed on Exhibit A become subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and (4) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 12 cases with one important exception, as more fully set forth herein. Scheduling Deadlines. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 12 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 05/11/2019. Defendant Fact Sheets due by 05/20/2019. Deadline for written discovery requests due by 06/20/2019. Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due by 08/19/2019. Expert disclosure served by defendants due by 09/18/2019. Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due by 09/25/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/25/2019. Filing of dispositive motions due by 11/01/2019. Response to dispositive motions due by 11/15/2019. Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/22/2019. Filing of Daubert motions due by 11/04/2019. Responses to Daubert motions due by 11/18/2019. Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/25/2019. Confidential Documents. Issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 9/20/2019, and any response is due by 10/3/2019. Any reply is due by 10/10/2019. Venue Recommendations. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no later than 10/08/2019, the parties are ORDERED to file joint venue recommendations by 10/18/2019. The parties' joint recommendation(s) shall identify cases where venue is in dispute. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/1/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 12 cases identified on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (brn) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5247 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/12/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (brn) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg. (Plattenberger, Jacob) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Maxwell S. Kennerly updating his contact information on behalf of Christopher Enborg, Terri Enborg. (Kennerly, Maxwell) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, LLC. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 53 (AGREED ORDER AND STIPULATION REGARDING THIRD PARTY SUBPOENAS) entered on 06/12/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (jap) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2535226. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cbo) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enborg et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Enborg
Represented By: Steven D. Davis, PHV
Represented By: Maxwell S. Kennerly, PHV
Represented By: Maxwell S. Kennerly, NCAED
Represented By: Steven Dean Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Enborg
Represented By: Steven D. Davis, PHV
Represented By: Maxwell S. Kennerly, PHV
Represented By: Maxwell S. Kennerly, NCAED
Represented By: Steven Dean Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Thomas, NCAED
Represented By: Pamela Lawrence Ferrell, PHV
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland, NCAED
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson, NCAED
Represented By: Christy D. Jones, PHV
Represented By: William M. Gage, NCAED
Represented By: Matthew P. Smith, PHV
Represented By: Joshua James Wes
Represented By: Matthew P. Smith, NCAED
Represented By: Pamela Lawrence Ferrell, NCAED
Represented By: Christy D. Jones, NCAED
Represented By: Nicholas V. Janizeh
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC
Represented By: David B. Thomas, NCAED
Represented By: Pamela Lawrence Ferrell, PHV
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson, NCAED
Represented By: William M. Gage, NCAED
Represented By: Pamela Lawrence Ferrell, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David B. Thomas, NCAED
Represented By: Pamela Lawrence Ferrell, PHV
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland, NCAED
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson, NCAED
Represented By: Christy D. Jones, PHV
Represented By: William M. Gage, NCAED
Represented By: Matthew P. Smith, PHV
Represented By: Joshua James Wes
Represented By: Matthew P. Smith, NCAED
Represented By: Pamela Lawrence Ferrell, NCAED
Represented By: Christy D. Jones, NCAED
Represented By: Nicholas V. Janizeh
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?