Escobar v. Capstone Logistics, LLC
Plaintiff: Ivan Escobar
Defendant: Capstone Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02501
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY by Ivan Escobar re #7 Motion to Remand. (Lee, Larry)
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Capstone Logistics, LLC by Ivan Escobar.(Lee, Larry)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 OPPOSITION by Capstone Logistics, LLC to #7 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meghan Nagel)(Curley, Justin) Modified on 2/9/2021 (Coll, A).
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 [DISREGARD - SEE #11 ] OPPOSITION by Capstone Logistics, LLC to #7 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meghan Nagel ISO Opposition to Motion to Remand)(Curley, Justin) Modified on 2/9/2021 (Benson, A.).
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): On the Court's own motion, the parties are hereby notified that #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand currently set for hearing on 2/22/2021 is continued to 3/8/2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, so that it may be heard along with #8 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims, Dismiss Class Claims, and Stay Proceedings. The motions briefing for #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand shall remain as if the motion was still set to be heard on 2/22/2021. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims, Dismiss Class Claims, and Stay Proceedings by Capstone Logistics, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Dickinson)(Curley, Justin) Modified on 1/22/2021 (Reader, L).
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to REMAND by Ivan Escobar. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Agnew, Kristen)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint by Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Curley, Justin) Modified on 12/21/2020 (Huang, H).
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kristen M. Agnew on behalf of Ivan Escobar. Attorney Agnew, Kristen M. added. (Agnew, Kristen)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Larry W. Lee on behalf of Ivan Escobar. Attorney Lee, Larry W. added. (Lee, Larry)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Capstone Logistics, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Curley, Justin)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UOE-2020-9429 by Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Declaration of Justin T. Curley, #5 Declaration of Cindy Davis, #6 Declaration of Meghan Nagel)(Curley, Justin)
December 17, 2020 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0972-9311129. (Curley, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escobar v. Capstone Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capstone Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Justin Taylor Maes Curley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Escobar
Represented By: Nicholas Rosenthal
Represented By: Kristen M. Agnew
Represented By: Larry W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?