(PC) Lake v. Diaz, et al.
Plaintiff: John Lake
Defendant: Dr. S. H. Wong-Do, Jean Weiss, Ralph Diaz, Patrick Lovello and Patrick Covello
Case Number: 2:2020cv02522
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to Amend Complaint and REQUEST for COPIES by John Lake. (Coll, A) (Response sent with copy procedures - The original complaint is 55 pages.) Modified on 2/16/2021 (Yin, K).
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #3 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/30/2020 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of John Lake. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/30/2020 GRANTING #3 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Henshaw, R)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order and #11 Order served on John Lake. (Henshaw, R)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by John Lake. (Coll, A)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for John Lake, CDC AF-8850 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Lundstrom, T)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-07618.
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. The Clerk shall transfer the case forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/21/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 12/21/2020.]
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by John Lake. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 12/21/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 12/21/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Lake, CDCR # AF8850.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020) [Transferred from cand on 12/21/2020.] .
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ralph Diaz, Patrick Lovello, Jean Weiss, S. H. Wong-Do. Filed by John Lake. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020) [Transferred from cand on 12/21/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Letter from John Lake. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020) [Transferred from cand on 12/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Lake v. Diaz, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. S. H. Wong-Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Lovello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?