Universal North America Ins. Co. v. Zuniga et al
Plaintiff: Universal North America Insurance Company
Defendant: Vanessa Zuniga and Timothy Zuniga
Case Number: 2:2021cv00092
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY by Universal North America Insurance Company to #9 Opposition to Motion. (Meyers, Dana) Modified on 3/17/2021 (Tupolo, A).
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 OPPOSITION by Timothy Zuniga, Vanessa Zuniga to #6 Motion to Remand. (Rice, Emily)
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order by Timothy Zuniga, Vanessa Zuniga. (Do, Jessica) Modified on 2/23/2021 (Coll, A).
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 3/25/2021 hearing on the Motion to Remand #6 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to REMAND to Remand to State Court by Universal North America Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dana N. Meyers, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Meyers, Dana) Modified on 2/10/2021 (Reader, L).
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kim Karelis on behalf of Timothy Zuniga, Vanessa Zuniga. Attorney Karelis, Kim added. (Karelis, Kim)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY Jessica Do for defendants Timothy Zuniga and Vanessa Zuniga. (Do, Jessica) Modified on 1/28/2021 (Kastilahn, A).
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Timothy Zuniga, Vanessa Zuniga.(Rice, Emily)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UPI-2020-0005997 by All Defendants. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9365660)(Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Lacey Rice, #2 Declaration of Filing in State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proof of Service)(Rice, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal North America Ins. Co. v. Zuniga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal North America Insurance Company
Represented By: Dana M. Meyers, NCAED
Represented By: Dana N. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Zuniga
Represented By: Jessica Bich Anh Do
Represented By: Emily Lacey Rice
Represented By: Kim Karelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Zuniga
Represented By: Jessica Bich Anh Do
Represented By: Emily Lacey Rice
Represented By: Kim Karelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?