McGill et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Charles McGill and Jacqueline Josephine McGill
Defendant: FCA US LLC and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00093
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 06/26/23, per #20 Stipulation, ORDERING for Defendant to satisfy Plaintiffs' reasonable fees, costs and expenses in the amount of $31,000.00. Payment is to be made to counsel for Plaintiffs within 60 days. (Benson, A.)
June 16, 2023 Filing 20 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Plaintiff's Costs and Expenses and REQUEST for ENTRY of ORDER by Charles McGill, Jacqueline Josephine McGill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 6/16/2023 (Perdue, C.).
May 31, 2023 Filing 19 JUDGMENT signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 05/30/23 in favor of Plaintiffs pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
May 24, 2023 Filing 18 REQUEST for ENTRY of JUDGMENT by Charles McGill, Jacqueline Josephine McGill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 5/25/2023 (Perdue, C.).
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/26/2022 ORDERING Attorney Spencer P. Hugret to appear for FCA US, LLC in place of attorney Scott S. Shepardson.(Reader, L)
July 27, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #17 Substitution of Attorney Order served on Tiana Dollin. (Reader, L)
July 22, 2022 Filing 16 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by FCA US, LLC. (Shepardson, Scott)
May 10, 2022 Filing 15 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Tionna Dolin for Charles McGill,Tionna Dolin for Jacqueline Josephine McGill, attorney Karin Kuemerle terminated (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariel Harman-Holmes on behalf of Charles McGill, Jacqueline Josephine McGill. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
January 29, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Tionna Dolin. Attorney Dolin, Tionna added. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 15, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Charles McGill, Jacqueline Josephine McGill. (Law, Daniel)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/13/2021 DENYING #5 Motion to Remand. (Huang, H)
December 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Charles McGill, Jacqueline Josephine McGill. Attorney Kuemerle, Karin added. (Kuemerle, Karin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY by Plaintiffs in SUPPORT of #5 Motion to Remand. (Law, Daniel) Modified on 4/5/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by FCA US, LLC. (Shepardson, Scott)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 OPPOSITION by FCA US, LLC to #5 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott S. Shepardson)(Shepardson, Scott)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 4/8/2021 hearing on the Motion to Remand #5 is VACATED and SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (York, M)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to REMAND by Charles McGill, Jacqueline Josephine McGill. Motion Hearing SET for 4/8/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Daniel Law, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order)(Law, Daniel) Modified on 3/4/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel Albert Law on behalf of Charles McGill, Jacqueline Josephine McGill. Attorney Law, Daniel Albert added. (Law, Daniel)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by FCA US LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil New Case Documents for MCE. (Shepardson, Scott)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2020-00282966-CU-BC-GDS by FCA US LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9366504) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of interested parties, #3 Declaration of Scott S. Shepardson, #4 Declaration of Sharon L. Stewart, #5 Exhibit A - Request for Dismissal, #6 Exhibit B - Complaint, #7 Exhibit C - Summons, #8 Exhibit D - Civil Case Coversheet, #9 Exhibit E - Notice of Case Assignment, #10 Exhibit F - Other docs served on FCA, #11 Exhibit G - FCA's answer to complaint, #12 Exhibit H - Elk Grove's answer to complaint, #13 Exhibit I - Elk Grove's Motion to Transfer, #14 Exhibit J - Order re venue transfer, #15 Exhibit K - Stip to transfer, #16 Exhibit L - Notice of Case Reassignment, #17 Exhibit M - Plaintiff's opp to Defendant's Motion to Transfer, #18 Exhibit N - Notice of outgoing transfer, #19 Exhibit O - Notice of CMC, #20 Exhibit P - Notice of submission of Petition for Coordination, #21 Exhibit Q - Notice of corrected submission, #22 Exhibit R - Pft's objs to Dft's Petition for Stay, #23 Exhibit S - Dealership's joinder to Petition for Coordination, #24 Exhibit T - Notice of entry of order, #25 Exhibit U - Notice of Ruling on Petition, #26 Exhibit V - FCA's MTC Arbitration, #27 Exhibit W - Elk Grove's MTC Arbitration, #28 Exhibit X - Notice of ruling on Writ Petition, #29 Exhibit Y - Pft's opp to Elk Grove's MTC Arbitration, #30 Exhibit Z - Peremptory Challenge, #31 Exhibit AA - Corrected POS re Peremptory Challenge, #32 Exhibit BB - Minute Order re Disqualification of Judge, #33 Exhibit CC - Notice of taking Elk Grove's MTC Arbitration off Calendar, #34 Exhibit DD - Pft's opp to FCA's MTC Arbitration, #35 Exhibit EE - FCA's 10-k filing)(Shepardson, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGill et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles McGill
Represented By: Tiana Dollin, NCAED
Represented By: Daniel Albert Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Josephine McGill
Represented By: Tiana Dollin, NCAED
Represented By: Daniel Albert Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Scott Steven Shepardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Scott Steven Shepardson
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?