Brooke v. International Suites LLC
Plaintiff: Theresa Brooke
Defendant: International Suites LLC Doing business as Holiday Inn Express & Suites Lincoln
Case Number: 2:2021cv00097
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Theresa Brooke. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Strojnik, Peter)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *International Suites LLC* (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to International Suites LLC by Theresa Brooke. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Strojnik, Peter)
February 14, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: International Suites LLC served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Strojnik, Peter)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *International Suites LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Peter Kristofer Strojnik* *Esplanade Center III, Suite 700* *2415 East Camelback Road* *Phoenix, AZ 85016*. (Benson, A.)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Suites LLC by Theresa Brooke. Attorney Strojnik, Peter added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9367039) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strojnik, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooke v. International Suites LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Suites LLC Doing business as Holiday Inn Express & Suites Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Brooke
Represented By: Peter Kristofer Strojnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?