(PC)White v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Sekayi R. White
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00118
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Sekayi R. White. (Zignago, K.)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-0118-JAM-DMC (PC). (Zignago, K.)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Zignago, K.)
January 27, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Sekayi R. White. (Yin, K)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from the Prison Account of Sekayi R. White signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/27/2021. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with this order. The appropriate agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/27/2021 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 request to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
January 22, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Sekayi R. White. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 2/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sekayi R. White. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, United States of America by Sekayi R. White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)White v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sekayi R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?