(PS) Gifford v. Hanson et al
Plaintiff: Roger Gifford
Defendant: Clint Dingman, Julie Bowles, Hornbrook Community Services District, Kevin Dixon, Patricia Brown, Melissa Tulledo, Michele Hanson and Robert Puckett, Sr.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00119
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Dennis M Cota
2 Judge: John A Mendez
3 Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Roger Gifford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Coll, A)
March 2, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Clerk's Entry of Default served on Roger Gifford. (Zignago, K.)
March 2, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Michele Hanson, Hornbrook Community Services District, Robert Puckett, Sr* (Zignago, K.)
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michele Hanson, Hornbrook Community Services District, Robert Puckett, Sr by Roger Gifford. (Zignago, K.)
February 11, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Civil New Case Documents served on Roger Gifford. (Zignago, K.)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Zignago, K.)
February 11, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Roger Gifford. (Zignago, K.)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/10/2021 RELATING cases 2:17-cv-02421-TLN-DMC and 2:21-cv-00119-JAM-AC. The action denominated 2:21-cv-00119-JAM-AC is REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be known as 2:21-cv-00119-TLN-DMC. (Zignago, K.)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Michele Hanson served on 1/31/2021, answer due 2/22/2021; Hornbrook Community Services District served on 1/31/2021, answer due 2/22/2021; Robert Puckett, Sr., served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. (Kastilahn, A)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of erroneous case assignment and REQUEST for Reassignment of Case to Redding Division by Roger Gifford. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 22, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Summons, #3 Civil New Case Documents served on Roger Gifford. (Huang, H)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Huang, H)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Julie Bowles, Patricia Brown, Clint Dingman, Kevin Dixon, Michele Hanson, Hornbrook Community Services District, Robert Puckett, Sr., Melissa Tulledo* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Roger Gifford* *15226 Hornbrook Rd.* *Hornbrook, CA 96044*. (Huang, H)
January 21, 2021 RECEIPT number #CAE200111581 $402.00 by Roger Gifford on 1/21/2021. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Roger Gifford.(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Gifford v. Hanson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Dingman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornbrook Community Services District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Tulledo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Puckett, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?