(PC) Jacques v. Fererkins et al
Plaintiff: Michael E. Jacques
Defendant: K. Place, A. Gorrell, B. Fererkins and Hurslander
Case Number: 2:2021cv00144
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF INTENT TO WAIVE SERVICE by defendants Brian Freriks, Kristin Place, Justin Huslander, Abigail Gorrell. AG Waiver of Service due in 30 days. (Coll, A)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Zignago, K.)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #2 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Michael E. Jacques signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/05/21. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/08/21. Consent or Decline due by 3/15/2021 (Plummer, M)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *B. Fererkins, A. Gorrell, Hurslander, K. Place* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael E. Jacques AX-5885* *California State Prison, Sacramento* *PO Box 290066* *Represa, California 95671-0066*. (Plummer, M)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/05/21 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. All fees shall be paid in accordance with the court's CDC order filed concurrently herewith. Also, FINDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE AND DIRECTING E-SERVICE on the following defendant(s): *B. Fererkins*, *K. Place*,*Hurslander*,*A. Gorrell*. Operative Complaint, Summons, Notice of E-Service Waiver and this Order served via email on CDCR. (Attachments: #1 CDCR Notice of Waiver) (Plummer, M)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, served on Michael E. Jacques. (Plummer, M)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate,,, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis,, served on Michael E. Jacques. (Plummer, M)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Michael E. Jacques. (Tupolo, A)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Michael E. Jacques, CDCR# AX-5885 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *1/25/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 3/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Zignago, K.)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Michael E. Jacques. (Zignago, K.)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Michael E. Jacques. (Zignago, K.)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Michael E. Jacques. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Jacques v. Fererkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Place
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Gorrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Fererkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurslander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?