Tackitt, et al., v. Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC, et al.,
Plaintiff: William "Billie&qu Farmer, Chuck Kamanski, Storm Donahue, Sharon McDonald, Randy Buchholtz, Z. D. T., Leonard McDonald, A. B., Cassie Barajas, Victoria Ford, Johanna L. Tackitt, Roger Donahue, Roberta Menzemer, H. B., Kimberly Medeiros, Deanna Holmes, John Wiley, Russ Barajas, Brian K. Johnson, Daniel A. Tackitt Doing business as Eastside Hay, Caren Campbell-Kamanski, John D. McKnight, G. A. P., Barry W. White, E. A. Trentham, Loretta Buchholtz, Charles Padilla, Janis L. McKnight, Sigmund Duverney, Kirk Johnson, Paul Kamanski, Jeanette "Janet&quo Kite, Aaron Dennis, Karen Donahue, Tennessee SC Kamanski, William Farmer, Jeanette Kite, Kayla Acquafondata, Kevin Morrison, E. P., Cody Brooks, G. P., Marion Wayland, Robert L. Noble, Caron A. Timpone, Julie Acquafondata, Janet, Darrell Wayland, Benjamin Paladino, Billie, Karen Rainey and Georgette Noble
Defendant: Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC, Algonquin Power & Utilities Corp., Par Electrical Contractors, Inc., Liberty Utilities Co. and Curtis and Sons Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00179
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
2 Judge: Troy L Nunley
3 Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/24/2021 ORDERING Curtis and Sons Construction, Inc's, response to #9 the First Amended Complaint is now be due on or before 4/30/2021 or, in the alternative, 5 days after this Court issues its rulings on both Plaintiffs' #19 Motion for Remand and Defendant Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric), LLC's #30 Motion to Strike whichever comes first, and CURTIS does not waive either its right to challenge the First Amended Complaint or right to raise affirmative defenses thereto through its responsive pleading.(Reader, L)
March 24, 2021 Filing 32 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Specially Appearing Defendant Curtis and Sons Construction, Inc. to respond to #9 First Amended Complaint by Curtis and Sons Construction, Inc. Attorney Kim, Dan D. ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kim, Dan)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/23/21 ORDERING that PAR's response to Plaintiffs' FAC shall now be due on or before April 30, 2021 or, in the alternative, five (5) days after this Court issues its rulings on both Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand and Defendant Liberty Utilities, LLC's Motion to Strike whichever comes first. (Kaminski, H)
March 23, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to STRIKE re #9 Amended Complaint. by Liberty Utilities Co.. Attorney Mijanovic, Krsto added. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #3 Declaration of Percy Stahl, #4 Index of Exhibits, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H)(Mijanovic, Krsto)
March 23, 2021 Filing 29 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Specially Appearing Defendant Par Electrical Contractors, Inc. to Respond to #9 Amended Complaint. Attorney Weiler, Eva Marie Mannoia added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weiler, Eva Marie) Modified on 3/24/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 19, 2021 Filing 28 CASE DISMISSED as to Defendant Algonquin Power & Utilities Corp., without prejudice, pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). See #27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
March 19, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of Defendant Algonquin Power & Utilities Corp. by all plaintiffs. (Liebman, Joseph)
March 12, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Par Electrical Contractors, Inc. served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. (Liebman, Joseph)
March 11, 2021 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Liberty Utilities Co. served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. (Liebman, Joseph)
March 9, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION TO STRIKE #9 Amended Complaint by Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC. Motion Hearing SET for 4/20/2021 at 1:30 PM before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Index of Exhibits, #12 Declaration of Percy Stahl) (Mijanovic, Krsto) Modified on 3/10/2021 (Michel, G.).
March 9, 2021 Filing 23 [DISREGARD - see #24 Motion to Strike] MOTION TO STRIKE #9 Amended Complaint by Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC. Motion Hearing SET for 4/21/2021 at 1:30 PM before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Index of Exhibits, #12 Declaration of Percy Stahl) (Mijanovic, Krsto) Modified on 3/10/2021 (Michel, G.).
March 9, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Geoffrey Joseph Spreter on behalf of Julie Acquafondata, et al. Attorney Spreter, Geoffrey Joseph added. (Spreter, Geoffrey) Modified on 3/9/2021 (Tupolo, A).
March 9, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Curtis and Sons Construction, Inc. served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Liebman, Joseph)
March 5, 2021 Filing 20 EXHIBITS A through I by Julie Acquafondata, et al re #19 Motion to Remand. (Liebman, Joseph) Modified on 3/8/2021 (Tupolo, A).
March 5, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED #11 MOTION to REMAND by Julie Acquafondata, et al., Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Liebman, #2 Proposed Order)(Liebman, Joseph) Modified on 3/5/2021 (Benson, A.).
March 4, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Benjamin David Petiprin on behalf of Daniel A. Tackitt. Attorney Petiprin, Benjamin David added. (Petiprin, Benjamin)
March 3, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Algonquin Power & Utilities Corp., Curtis and Sons Construction, Inc., Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC, Liberty Utilities Co., Par Electrical Contractors, Inc. * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Alexander Robertson* *Robertson & Associates, LLP* *32121 Lindero Canyon Road, Suite 200* *Westlake Village, CA 91361*. [re-issued with correct judge initials] (Donati, J)
March 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Plaintiffs. Attorney Curtis, Robert added. (Curtis, Robert) Modified on 3/4/2021 (Reader, L).
March 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Plaintiffs. Attorney Liebman, Joseph added. (Liebman, Joseph) Modified on 3/4/2021 (Reader, L).
March 1, 2021 Filing 14 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/26/21 ORDERING that the actions denominated 2:21-CV-00179 TLN-JDP and 2:21-CV-00180 MCE-DB be reassigned to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as 2:21-CV-00179 JAM-DB and 2:21-CV-00180 JAM-DB. (Kaminski, H)
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Algonquin Power & Utilities Corp., Curtis and Sons Construction, Inc., Liberty Utilities Co., Par Electrical Contractors, Inc. * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Alexander Robertson* *Robertson & Associates, LLP* *32121 Lindero Canyon Road, Suite 200* *Westlake Village, CA 91361*. (Becknal, R)
February 24, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to REMAND by Plaintiffs' Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Robertson, IV, #2 Proposed Order)(Robertson, Alexander) Modified on 2/24/2021 (Reader, L).
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:21-cv-00180-MCE-DB, 2:21-cv-00163-JAM-DB by Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC. (Scordalakis, Steven)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by . Attorney Robertson, Alexander added.(Robertson, Alexander) Modified on 2/24/2021 (Kastilahn, A).
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:21-CV-180-MCE-DB by Plaintiffs. (Robertson, Alexander)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL Alexander Robertson by All Plaintiffs. (Robertson, Alexander) Modified on 2/17/2021 (Kastilahn, A).
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by A. B., H. B., Cassie Barajas, et al.. (Robertson, Alexander) Modified on 2/16/2021 (Kastilahn, A).
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lisa Tamiko Omoto on behalf of Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC. Attorney Omoto, Lisa Tamiko added. (Omoto, Lisa)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Scordalakis, Steven)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Order by Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC. Attorney Scordalakis, Steven Andrew added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scordalakis, Steven) .
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Mono County Superior Court, case number CV200098 by Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9384714) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Answer, #3 Declaration, #4 Notice of Interested Parties, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Jury Demand) (Mijanovic, Krsto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tackitt, et al., v. Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William "Billie&qu Farmer
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck Kamanski
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Storm Donahue
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon McDonald
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Buchholtz
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z. D. T.
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard McDonald
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. B.
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassie Barajas
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Ford
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johanna L. Tackitt
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Donahue
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Menzemer
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. B.
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Medeiros
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Holmes
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wiley
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russ Barajas
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K. Johnson
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel A. Tackitt Doing business as Eastside Hay
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caren Campbell-Kamanski
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. McKnight
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. A. P.
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry W. White
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. A. Trentham
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Buchholtz
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Padilla
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis L. McKnight
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigmund Duverney
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Johnson
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Kamanski
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette "Janet&quo Kite
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Dennis
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Donahue
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee SC Kamanski
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Farmer
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Kite
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Acquafondata
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Morrison
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. P.
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Brooks
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. P.
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Wayland
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Noble
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caron A. Timpone
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Acquafondata
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Wayland
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Paladino
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Rainey
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgette Noble
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Geoffrey Joseph Spreter
Represented By: Benjamin David Petiprin
Represented By: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Represented By: Steven Andrew Scordalakis
Represented By: Lisa Tamiko Omoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Algonquin Power & Utilities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Electrical Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Utilities Co.
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis and Sons Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Dan D. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?