Timpone v. Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC
Plaintiff: E. P., Cody Brooks, Julie Acquafondata, G. P., Benjamin Paladino, Karen Rainey, Kevin Morrison, Robert L. Noble, Caron A. Timpone, Georgette Noble and Kayla Acquafondata
Defendant: Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC and Algonquin Power & Utilities Corp.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00180
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
2 Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to DISMISS by Julie Acquafondata, et al. Attorney Liebman, Joseph added. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liebman, Joseph) Modified on 3/8/2021 (Tupolo, A).
March 1, 2021 Filing 14 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/26/21 ORDERING that the actions denominated 2:21-CV-00179 TLN-JDP and 2:21-CV-00180 MCE-DB be reassigned to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as 2:21-CV-00179 JAM-DB and 2:21-CV-00180 JAM-DB. (Kaminski, H)
February 25, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 4/8/2021 hearing on the Motion to Remand Action to the Superior Court for the State of California #11 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
February 24, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to REMAND by Julie Acquafondata et al. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Robertson IV, #2 Proposed Order)(Robertson, Alexander) Modified on 2/25/2021 (Coll, A).
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:21-cv-00179-TLN-JDP, 2:21-cv-00163-JAM-DB by Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC. (Scordalakis, Steven)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:21-CV-00179-TLN-JDP by Julie Acquafondata, Kayla Acquafondata, Cody Brooks, Kevin Morrison, Georgette Noble, Robert L. Noble, E. P., G. P., Benjamin Paladino, Karen Rainey, Caron A. Timpone. (Robertson, Alexander)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Julie Acquafondata et al. (Robertson, Alexander)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by All Plaintiffs. (Robertson, Alexander) Modified on 2/18/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Plaintiffs. (Robertson, Alexander) Modified on 2/18/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lisa Tamiko Omoto on behalf of Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC. Attorney Omoto, Lisa Tamiko added. (Omoto, Lisa)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mijanovic, Krsto)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Order by Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC. Attorney Scordalakis, Steven Andrew added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order))(Scordalakis, Steven)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Mono County Superior Court, case number CV210006 by Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9384731) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Answer, #3 Declaration, #4 Notice of Interested Parties, #5 Jury Demand , #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mijanovic, Krsto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timpone v. Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. P.
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Brooks
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Acquafondata
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. P.
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Paladino
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Rainey
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Morrison
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Noble
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caron A. Timpone
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgette Noble
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Acquafondata
Represented By: Alexander Robertson
Represented By: Joseph Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Represented By: Steven Andrew Scordalakis
Represented By: Lisa Tamiko Omoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Algonquin Power & Utilities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?