(PC) Coronado v. Saukhla
Plaintiff: Issac M. Coronado
Defendant: Narinder Saukhla
Case Number: 2:2021cv00215
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Issac M. Coronado. (Rodriguez, E) Modified on 3/10/2021 (Plummer, M).
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-00215-WBS CKD (PC). (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Issac M. Coronado. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/10/2021 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed ifp or the required fees in the amount of $402.00. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. The Clerk shall send plaintiff an ifp application. (Yin, K)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and ifp form served on Issac M. Coronado. (Yin, K)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *2/3/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Coll, A)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Issac M. Coronado. (Coll, A)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Narinder Saukhla by Issac M. Coronado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Coronado v. Saukhla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narinder Saukhla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issac M. Coronado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?